This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 16:23:47 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE VS DESERT VILLAGE

Case Summary

On 08/15/2014 WESCO INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DESERT VILLAGE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4411

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

GREGORY MCCORMACK

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DESERT VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

EVELYN M NICHOLSON

GOLD COAST ENTERPRISES

UFFELMAN PROPERTIES INC

DON FEXLER

KIMBERLY FEXER

WHITESTAR MANAGEMENT INC

EVELYN NICHOLSON

DESERT VILLAGE

WHITE STAR MANAGEMENT INC

KIM FEXER

DON FEXER

WESTERN PACIFIC ROOFING CORP

WHITESTAR MANAGMENT INC

PREMIER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

DONNA FEXLER

WHITE STAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Not Classified By Court

"PSC1405836 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT"

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AIRES LAW GROUP

180 Newport Center Drive Suite 260

Newport Beach, CA 92660

AIRES LAW FIRM

6 Hughes Suite 205

Irvine, CA 92618

RAYNES/ERICKSON

300 E State Street Ste 690

Redlands, CA 92373

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VIVIAN L SCHWARTZ

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

BREMER & WHYTE

20320 S.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& OMEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd #110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd #110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

GATES ODOHERTY GONTER & GUY

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

GATES O'DOHERTY GONTER & GUY

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 14Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

VEATCH CARLSON

1055 Wilshire Blvd 11Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DESERT VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; MAILING DATE OF 08/27/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/07/2014 OF EVELYN NICHOLSON SERVED ON PREMIER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/12/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/19/2014 OF DON FEXER SERVED ON WESTERN PACIFIC ROOFING CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/16/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY E

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY EVELYN NICHOLSON FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY NAMING DOES 1 TO BE DON FEXER FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY NAMING DOES 3 TO BE WHITE STAR MANAGEMENT INC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (PSC 14

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (PSC 1404411) BY DON FEXER, KIMBERLY FEXER FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT DESERT VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ADDING ATTORNEY BREMER & WHYTE FILED.

DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY CARL AI

DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY CARL AIRES IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR NOT FILING DEFAULT FILED

NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE BY CLERK

NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE BY CLERK.

DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY CARL AI

DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY CARL AIRES IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT KIM FEXER, DON FEXER ADDING ATTORNEY VEATCH CARLSON FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY D

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DON FEXLER, WHITESTAR MANAGEMENT INC, KIMBERLY FEXER FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF 8/1/16 MINUTE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • FAX FILING BY GREGORY MCCORMACK ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/04/2014 OF "PSC1405836 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT" FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • UPDATE CASE NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • FAX FILING BY GREGORY MCCORMACK ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/04/2014 OF "PSC1405836 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT" AS TO DEFENDANT WHITESTAR MANAGEMENT INC, DON FEXER, KIMBERLY FEXER FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/04/2014 OF "PSC1405836 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT" AS TO DEFENDANT EVELYN NICHOLSON FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/04/2014 OF "PSC1405836 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT" AS TO DEFENDANT DESERT VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, GOLD COAST ENTERPRISES FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # PSC 1405836 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO EVELYN NICHOLSON; MAILING DATE OF 09/04/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY BY DESERT VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF VIVIAN L SCHWARTZ FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DESERT VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; MAILING DATE OF 08/27/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less