Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/31/2018 at 10:08:59 (UTC).

WENCHELL VS VIP ASSOCIATES INC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 WENCHELL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VIP ASSOCIATES INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5002

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRIS WENCHELL

Defendants

MITCH SANBORN

V.I.P. ASSOCIATES INC

THOMAS MITCHELL SANBORN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MAURO FIORE JR

136 East Lemon Ave

Monrovia, CA 91016

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO 1/23/1

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO 1/23/18 HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO V.I.P. ASSOCIATES INC; MAILING DATE OF 06/13/17 FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO THOMAS MITCHELL SANBORN; MAILING DATE OF 05/22/17 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

ERRATA/NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED

ERRATA/NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY CHRIS WENCHELL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF: NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF: NOTICE OF ERRATA AND ORDER FILED

DECLARATION OF SERGIO J PUCHE

DECLARATION OF SERGIO J PUCHE IN OPPOSITION OF SANCTIONS FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON TH

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO V.I.P. ASSOCIATES INC, THOMAS MITCHELL SANBORN FILED. DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. (CIV-100)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

NOTICE OF PAYMENT BY CHRIS WEN

NOTICE OF PAYMENT BY CHRIS WENCHELL FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO ANY DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT SHALL HAVE BEEN FILED PRIOR TO 11/02/17; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO 1/23/18 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S); Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PAYMENT BY CHRIS WENCHELL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO ANY DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT SHALL HAVE BEEN FILED PRIOR TO 11/02/17; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO V.I.P. ASSOCIATES INC, THOMAS MITCHELL SANBORN FILED. DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. (CIV-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2017
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 05/22/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE:SANCTIONS SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 7/26/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AS TO THOMAS MITCHELL SANBORN; MAILING DATE OF 05/22/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF CHRIS WENCHELL AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less