This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2016 at 15:06:56 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO VS CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS

Case Summary

On 07/31/2012 WELLS FARGO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5391

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Respondents

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE

CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS A FEDERALLY

EAST VALLEY TOURIST DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY

Defendants, Respondents, Intervenor Plaintiffs and Intervenors

GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES

GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES SECOND

GOLDENTREE 2004 TRUST

Defendants, Appellants, Respondents and Intervenors

CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS A FEDERALLY

EAST VALLEY TOURIST DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY

GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES

GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES SECOND

GOLDENTREE 2004 TRUST

Plaintiffs, Appellants, Respondents and Intervenors

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE

CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS A FEDERALLY

EAST VALLEY TOURIST DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY

GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES

GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES SECOND

GOLDENTREE 2004 TRUST

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

HON. TERRY FRIEDMAN (RET)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

BROWNE GOERGE ROSS

2121 Ave Of The Stars, #2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

BROWNE GEORGE ROSSLLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

1800 Century Park East #1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1517

Respondent, Defendant, Intervenor Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorney

LATHAM & WATKINS

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Appellant, Respondent, Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

1800 Century Park East #1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1517

LATHAM & WATKINS

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff, Appellant, Respondent and Intervenor Attorneys

BROWNE GEORGE ROSSLLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

1800 Century Park East #1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1517

LATHAM & WATKINS

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR

OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELI

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANS AND EAST VALLEY TO FILED

DECLARATION OF TED S LODGE IN

DECLARATION OF TED S LODGE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF TE

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF TED S LODGE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERICAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE.

STATEMENT (STATUS CONFERENCE)

STATEMENT (STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY GOLDENTREE 2004 TRUST, GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES, GOLDENTREE CREDIT OPPORTUNITIESSECOND

FILED: DISCOVERABILITY OF DOCU

FILED: DISCOVERABILITY OF DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY DEFENDANTS LISTED ON PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE TRANSMISSION OF PROPOSE

NOTICE TRANSMISSION OF PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FILED.

FILED: (REDACTED) APPENDIX OF

FILED: (REDACTED) APPENDIX OF DECLS & EXHIBITS IN SUP OF PLTFS OPPO TO INTERVENOR-DEFTS MOTION

REPLY TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF

REPLY TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADJUDICATION BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANSA FEDERALLY, EAST VALLEY TOURISTDEVELOPMENTAUTHORITY FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANSA FEDERALLY, EAST VALLEY TOURISTDEVELOPMENTAUTHORITY.

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND M

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS FILED BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANSA FEDERALLY, EAST VALLEY TOURISTDEVELOPMENTAUTHORITY.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

DECLARATION OF ROBERT WRIXON I

DECLARATION OF ROBERT WRIXON I/S OF CABAZON BANK OF MISSION INDIA NS MOTION FOR ORDER WAIVING REQUIREMENT FILED

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE OR IN THE

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TAX COSTS BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FILED

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFTS

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFTS MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COS TS OF PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANSA FEDERALLY, EAST VALLEY TOURISTDEVELOPMENTAUTHORITY FILED.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS.

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL.

274 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • OPINION RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO JUDGE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL MATTER RE ORAL ARGUMT TAKEN OFF CALEDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL RULING RESERVED FOR CONSIDERATION OF RJN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL RULING IS RESERVED CONSIDERATION ON RJN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL 4/7/14 NOTICE OF INTERVENER APPROVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL RULING REVERSED RE JUDICIAL NTC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
536 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (NIGHT COURT) SET FOR 12/28/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ENTIRE CASE - OTHER: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT BY CABAZON BAND OF MISSION INDIANSA FEDERALLY, EAST VALLEY TOURISTDEVELOPMENTAUTHORITY FILED (FORM CM-180).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE TEMPORARY RETRAINING ORDER.; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY EX PARTE FOR HEARING 08/02/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • APPENDIX OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2012 OF WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92203-3495.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less