This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/09/2016 at 15:26:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK VS MASTEK

Case Summary

On 03/20/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MASTEK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1309

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

RREF-LA QUINTA 2 LLC

Defendant

MASTEK LLC

Other

ROBERT P MOSIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERKINS COIE

1888 Century Park E Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Other Attorney

MOSIER & COMPANY

3151 Airway Avenue Suite A-1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

DECLARATION OF ROBERT P MOSIER

DECLARATION OF ROBERT P MOSIER IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APP FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING FILED

DECLARATION OF GABRIEL LIAO IN

DECLARATION OF GABRIEL LIAO IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APP FOR APPOINTME NT OF RECEIVER AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED

DECLARATION OF CHRIS BRANTLEY

DECLARATION OF CHRIS BRANTLEY IN SUPP OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER FILED

ORDER (EX PARTE) APPOINTING RE

ORDER (EX PARTE) APPOINTING RECEIVER/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

UNDERTAKING BOND FOR RECEIVER

UNDERTAKING BOND FOR RECEIVER FILED. BOND 1000999149 BOND AMOUNT $50000.00 INSURANCE/SURETY COMPANY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF FILING BOND AND OATH

NOTICE OF FILING BOND AND OATH OF RECEIVER BY ROBERT P MOSIER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF FILING BOND AND OATH OF RECEIVER ON ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/06/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

FILED: PLTFFS BOND UNDER CODE

FILED: PLTFFS BOND UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 566B

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2015 OF WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TO MASTEK LLC; MAILING DATE OF 04/09/15 FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC H

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC HEARING RE CONFIRMATION OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA FILED.

ORDER CONFIRMING APPOINTMENT O

ORDER CONFIRMING APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER & PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN AID OF RECEIVER; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONFI

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONFIRMING APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO SUBSTITUTE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST ASPLAINTIFF IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RREF-LA QUINTA 2 LLC

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER APP

NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER APPROVING RECEIVERS FINAL ACCOUNT & REPORT FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER APPROVING RECEIVERS FINAL ACCOUNT & REPORT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE APPROVAL OF THE RECEIVERS FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: RECEIVERS FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT - RES54603; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR RE RECIEVERS REQ FOR APPROVAL OF THE FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND REL ITEMS/DECL OF RECIEVER BY ROBERT P MOSIER; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • PROPER/WAIVED POS - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR RECEIVERS REQ FOR APPROVAL OF THE FINAL ACCOUNT ON CALENDAR 04/21/16 IS PROPER/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Confirm Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: RECIEVERS FINAL ACCOUNT SET FOR 04/21/16 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2015
  • MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION SET FOR 03/30/15 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK FOR HEARING 03/30/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • FEE PAID FOR ON-LINE RESERVATION OF MOTION ($60.00). CONFIRMATION NUMBER RES43534 FOR HEARING RESERVED ON 03/30/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR EX PARTE HEARING SET 03/30/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS2 - RES43534.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR N.A. ON AS TRUSTEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF WELLS FARGO BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mastek Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant