This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/17/2018 at 21:23:16 (UTC).

WAYNE'S ENGINE VS BOGLE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2003 WAYNE'S ENGINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOGLE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0587

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC

Defendant

EDWARD BOGLE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA

ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAI

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA-AS TO BRENDA BOGLE FILED.

ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA

ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORIGINAL S

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA-AS TO EDWARD BOGLE FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRENDA BOGLE BY WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK (CORONA SMALL CLAIMS).

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR EDWARD BOGLE BY WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK (CORONA SMALL CLAIMS).

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA;

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - CORONA FILED 01/13/2003 OF WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC SERVED ON EDWARD BOGLE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/14/03 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA-AS TO BRENDA BOGLE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA-AS TO EDWARD BOGLE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION (SMALL CLAIMS) ON EDWARD BOGLE BY WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC (HEARING); Disposition: Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION (SMALL CLAIMS) ON BRENDA BOGLE BY WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC (HEARING); Disposition: Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CIVIL SUBPOENA ISSUED AS TO EDWARD BOGLE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CIVIL SUBPOENA ISSUED AS TO BRENDA BOGLE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • DocketHEARING ON JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION (SMALL CLAIMS) SET 8/18/03 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRENDA BOGLE BY WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK (CORONA SMALL CLAIMS).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • DocketHEARING ON JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION (SMALL CLAIMS) SET 8/18/03 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR EDWARD BOGLE BY WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK (CORONA SMALL CLAIMS).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - CORONA FILED 01/13/2003 OF WAYNE'S ENGINE REBUILDERS, INC SERVED ON EDWARD BOGLE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/14/03 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 3/10/03 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. C2 - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • DocketCLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED - CORONA (NOT USED SINCE 2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less