This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 04:36:07 (UTC).

WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC VS ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2013 WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0420

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Cross Defendants

WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC

ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW JERSEY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

ASR CONTRACTORS INC

ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC

THE CITY OF PALM DESERT

CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES/FEDERAL

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW JERSEY

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

THE CITY OF PALM DESERT

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ERICJ. PHILLIPS

4115 Blackhawk Plaza Circle Suite 100

Danville, CA 94506

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC J PHILLIPS

2950 Buskirk Ave Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

LESTER & CANTRELL LLP

1700 Iowa Ave., Ste. 200

Riverside, CA 92507

SALAMIRAD MORROW TIMPANE & DUNN

19200 Von Karman Ave Ste 400

Irvine, CA 92612

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LESTER & CANTRELL LLP

1700 Iowa Ave., Ste. 200

Riverside, CA 92507

SALAMIRAD MORROW TIMPANE & DUNN

19200 Von Karman Ave Ste 400

Irvine, CA 92612

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

655 West Broadway 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

SALAMIRAD MORROW TIMPANE & DUNN LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

655 West Broadway 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT O

NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL. RECORD DUE ON 12/14/16.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF THE CITY OF PALM DESERT AS TO FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A NEWJERSEY WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/26/13

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF THE CITY OF PALM DESERT BY ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC REPRESENTED BY LESTER & CANTRELL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC HEARING RE SANCTIONS - UNSERVED PARTIES.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE CITY OF PALM DESERT

OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION

OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ERIC PHILLIPS BY FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE CITY OF PALM DESERT

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC BY THE CITY OF PALM DESERT REPRESENTED BY BEST BEST & KRIEGER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO OPPOSIT

REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AME BY WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 2ND A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC AS TO DEFENDANT THE CITY OF PALM DESERT FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

OBJECTIONS TO LATE FILED OPPOS

OBJECTIONS TO LATE FILED OPPOSITION TO MTN/SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

DECLARATION OF ERIC PHILLIPS I

DECLARATION OF ERIC PHILLIPS IN SUPPORT OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INCS OPPO TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNS

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC BYLESTER & CANTRELL LLP FILED (FORM MC-051).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTO

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC BY LESTER & CANTRELL LLP FILED

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING AFFIRMED; JUSTICE CODRINGTON, SLOUGH, FIELDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • OPINION RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO JUDGE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL RESPONDENT IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION TO FILE BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO CLERK OF THE COURT DOC#1907999207, IN THE AMOUNT OF $166.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO T DICKNEIDER DOC#1907999208, IN THE AMOUNT OF $52.40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO LAW OFFICE OF ERIC PHILLIPS DOC#1907999327, IN THE AMOUNT OF $121.60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • APPEALS REQUEST FOR PAYMENT/DISBURSEMENT FOR RECORD ON APPEAL FORWARDED TO ACCOUNTING 12/1/16 CLOSEOUT.

    Read MoreRead Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • -- AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF THE CITY OF PALM DESERT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC AND MAILED ON 02/19/13 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF THE CITY OF PALM DESERT REPRESENTED BY BEST BEST & KRIEGER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2013 OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC AS TO CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES/FEDERAL; MAILING DATE OF 02/14/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2013 OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC AS TO ASR CONSTRUCTORS INC; MAILING DATE OF 01/29/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2013 OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC AS TO THE CITY OF PALM DESERT; MAILING DATE OF 01/26/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/17/2013 OF WATERWORKS INDUSTRIES INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less