Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2017 at 06:12:12 (UTC).

WATERSTONE I II III APARTMENTS VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 WATERSTONE I II III APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4951

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP

Defendants

HOMERO MARTINEZ

ABEL MARTINEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIMM & SCHOLNICK

P.O. Box 7255

Van Nuys, CA 91409-7255

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ABEL MARTINEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92881.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/12/17

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO HOMERO MARTINEZ; AND MAILED ON 03/23/17 FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/23/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AS TO ABEL MARTINEZ FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS JU

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AS TO HOMERO MARTINEZ, ABEL MARTINEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/23/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • --ALSO ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AS TO HOMERO MARTINEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AS TO HOMERO MARTINEZ, ABEL MARTINEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO HOMERO MARTINEZ; AND MAILED ON 03/23/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ABEL MARTINEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AS TO ABEL MARTINEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/22/17 AT 8:00 IN CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF WATERSTONE III IIIAPARTMENTS NF LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less