This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 08:34:51 (UTC).

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO vs J&S (AMERICAN ELECTRICAL SERVICES) INC

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J S AMERICAN ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3781

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SHOWPROP MENIFEE LLC

MICHAEL RAY SMITH

SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC

J&S (AMERICAN ELECTRICAL SERVICES) INC

TMS CONTRUCTION INC

REEL SERVICES MANAGEMENT LLC

KRIKORIAN PREMIERE THEATRES

TMSGC

GEORGE KRIKORIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHERTURNER SENET & WITTBRODT

1880 Century Park East 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER SENET & WITTBRODT

Attorney at GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER SENET & WITTBRODT

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Charles Lewis Pernicka

Angelina Maria Plumtree

James Charles Earle

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)

01/19/2021: Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

12/17/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

Cross-Complaint

11/30/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service Re Showprop Menifee, LLC and Showprop Menifee DE, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC

11/30/2020: Proof of Service Re Showprop Menifee, LLC and Showprop Menifee DE, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC

Notice of Filing Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate

11/17/2020: Notice of Filing Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate

Defendant TMS Construction, Inc. DBA Tms-GC's Answer to Plaintiff Walters Wholesale Electric Company's Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

11/13/2020: Defendant TMS Construction, Inc. DBA Tms-GC's Answer to Plaintiff Walters Wholesale Electric Company's Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

Cross-Complaint of TMS Construction, Inc dba TMS-GC for: 1. Breach of Contract

11/13/2020: Cross-Complaint of TMS Construction, Inc dba TMS-GC for: 1. Breach of Contract

Proof of Service by Electronic Service of NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 10/14/20 filed. (non-complaint)

10/14/2020: Proof of Service by Electronic Service of NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 10/14/20 filed. (non-complaint)

Notice OF AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC, SHOWPROP MENIFEE LLC filed.

10/14/2020: Notice OF AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC, SHOWPROP MENIFEE LLC filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO served on J&S (AMERICAN ELECTRICAL SERVICES) INC with service date of 10/08/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

10/13/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO served on J&S (AMERICAN ELECTRICAL SERVICES) INC with service date of 10/08/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

Notice of Lis Pendens (copy) filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO.

10/06/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens (copy) filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO.

System Generated Notice re: of Department Assignment & Notice of CMC.

09/28/2020: System Generated Notice re: of Department Assignment & Notice of CMC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of order consolidating cases for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/17/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *0399 Receipt No.: 20201217-00474.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Michael Ray Smith's Answer to Complaint on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO; Filed By: MICHAEL RAY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: TMS Construction, Inc., dba TMS-GC's Answer to Showprop Menifee, LLC and Showprop Menifee DE, LLC's Cross-Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Cross-Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE LLC; Filed By: TMS CONTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/10/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *0399 Receipt No.: 20201210-00664.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/01/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *8171 Receipt No.: 20201201-00351.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO served on TMS CONTRUCTION INC with service date of 10/08/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO filed.; Filed By: WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Lis Pendens (copy) filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO.; Filed By: WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/28/2020; Fine Description: Check #3756747 Receipt No.: CV200928-0066-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: of Department Assignment & Notice of CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REEL SERVICES MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TMSGC is a litigant

Latest cases where J&S INC. is a litigant