This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/05/2019 at 02:56:23 (UTC).

WALKER VS BANK OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 WALKER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6279

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALKER

KAREN WALKER

La Quinta, CA 92253

MICHAEL H WALKER

La Quinta, CA 92253

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA

BANK OF AMERICA N A A BUSINESSENTITY

CALIFORNIA T D SPECIALIST S A BUSINESS ENTITY

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC A BUSNIESS ENTITY

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC A BUSINESS ENTITY

PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DEIV INC A

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS A BUSINESS ENTITY

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DEIV INC

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOUIS|WHITE PC

1851 Heritage Lane Ste 148

Sacramento, CA 95815

LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J HUNTER

2825 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite 202

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Defendant Attorneys

SEVERSON & WERSON

19100 Von Karman, Ste 700

Irvine, CA 92612

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont Dr., Ste. 300

Irvine, CA 92612

GHIDOTTI BERGER LLP

1920 Old Tustin Ave

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J HUNTER FOR PARTY(S) MICHAEL H WALKER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/4/19

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FCI LENDER SERVICESINC, PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DEIV INC, CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

FILED: DEFENDANTS DITECH FINAN

FILED: DEFENDANTS DITECH FINANCIAL LLC AND GREEN TREE SERVICING LLCS 1ST AMENDED BK STATUS REPORT

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONF & OSC 7/31/19

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FCI LENDER SERVICESINC, PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DEIV INC, CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MICHAEL H WALKER, KAREN WALKER FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF NON

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF NON OPPOSTITION TO THE DEMURRER SERVED ON M.HUNTER/M.WALKER AND K.WALKER SERVED 03/14/19 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) MICHAEL H WALKER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J HUNTER

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - BANKRUPTCY AS TO DEFENDANT GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FILED. (FORM CM-180)

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION FILED BY GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY, DITECH FINANCIAL LLC PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2) (FORM CIV-141).

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADIN

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS BY BANK OF AMERICA N AA BUSINESSENTITY FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA N AA BUSINESSENTITY.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER BY GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY, DITECH FINANCIAL LLC REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION P

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CCP 405.20 BY MICHAEL H WALKER, KAREN WALKER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER SERVED ON FCI LENDER SERVICESINC A BUSINESS ENTITY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/25/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER AS TO DEFENDANT REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC A BUSNIESS ENTITY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER AND FILED.

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • HEARING RE: BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • MICHAEL H WALKER, KAREN WALKER/LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J HUNTER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE /COMPLY WITH COURTS ORDER OF 6/25/19..; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NA FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL.; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2018 OF MICHAEL WALKER REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J HUNTER FOR PARTY(S) MICHAEL H WALKER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • -- AND SUBSTITUTE OUT ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW J HUNTER AS TO KAREN WALKER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • UPDATE PARTY KAREN WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DEIV INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY FCI LENDER SERVICESINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • UPDATE PARTY CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS is a litigant

Latest cases where FCI LENDER SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Walker is a litigant

Latest cases where Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a litigant