This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/03/2016 at 05:51:27 (UTC).

VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN VS. EYEROO CORPORATION; ET

Case Summary

On 07/12/2013 VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EYEROO CORPORATION ET. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4486

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN

Defendants

GREEN AWAKENING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

EYEROO CORPORATIONA NEVADA CORPORATION

BUYROO A BUSINESS ORGANIZATIONFORM

ALAN PAINTER

HELEN GIBBEL PAINTER

HALDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION A NEVADA

PACIFIC CHARTER FINANCIAL SERVICES

JOHN WRIGHT

San Clemente, CA 92674

ROBERT C BREHM

US MICROBICS INC ACOLORADO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OKANE & MCKEE LLP

140 Luring Drive Suite E

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HERBERT PAPENFUSS

3604 Azure Circle

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AND FILED.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPR

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPRINGS AND REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO PS2 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO US MICROBICS INC ACOLORADO CORPORATION WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/20/13

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY V

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO BUYROO A BUSINESS ORGANIZATIONFORM; MAILING DATE OF 04/02/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO HALDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION A NEVADA; MAILING DATE OF 04/02/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO GREEN AWAKENING LLCA CALIFORNIA LIMITED; MAILING DATE OF 04/07/14 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO US MICROBICS INC ACOLORADO CORPORATION FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN SERVED ON JOHN WRIGHT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/14/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO ROBERT C BREHM; MAILING DATE OF 04/08/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO ALAN PAINTER; MAILING DATE OF 04/11/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO HELEN GIBBEL PAINTER; MAILING DATE OF 04/11/14 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN BY JOHN WRIGHT REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRAN

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER TO ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT-SANTA ANA HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • CASE ORDERED TRANSFERRED (OUT) TO THE SANTA ANA-CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER COURT-COUNTY OF ORANGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • CHECK #20892 IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD SENT TO THE 700 CIVIC CENTER DR SANTA ANA-SUPERIOR COURT--COUNTY OF ORANGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER TO ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT-SANTA ANA HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO EYEROO CORPORATIONA NEVADA CORPORATION, ALAN PAINTER, HELEN GIBBEL PAINTER, HALDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION A NEVADA, PACIFIC CHARTER FINANCIAL SERVICES, ROBERT C BREHM ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF HERBERT PAPENFUSS ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY EYEROO CORPORATIONA NEVADA CORPORATION, ALAN PAINTER, HELEN GIBBEL PAINTER, HALDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION A NEVADA, PACIFIC CHARTER FINANCIAL SERVICES, ROBERT C BREHM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • FAX FILING BY JOHN WRIGHT ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AS TO US MICROBICS INC ACOLORADO CORPORATION WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/20/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPRINGS AND REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO PS2 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2013 OF VIRGIL FRANKLIN DURLIN INDIVIDUALLY AND IN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less