Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 20:21:19 (UTC).

VIDAL VS PULTE HOME

Case Summary

On 08/02/2007 VIDAL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7003

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISSA KHALAF

DEBRA MURRAY

MADELINE HERNANDEZ

JAMAYYAH AZZIA

LUIS VIDAL

KARI GRAZIOSE

TOMMY SICILIANO

OSVALDO LLAMAS

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

J.T. TILE & MARBLE, INC

PRECISE GRADE, INC

JENSTAR ENTERPRISES, INC

ALACRON SONS, INC

CROSS STATE ELECTRIC INC

MERILLAT CORPORATION

DCE CONSTRUCTION INC.

D-BEST TUBS/SHOWERS INSTALLATIONS, INC.

FENCEWORKS INC

WALLDESIGN INCORPORATED

SILVERADO PLASTERING, INC.

CROSS STATE ELECTRIC

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERSON & KRIGER

2155 Chicago Avenue Suite 300

Riverside, CA 92507

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

KRUTCIK & GEORGGIN

26021 Acero

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

ORLAND LAW GROUP

1334 Parkview Ave., Ste. 100

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

COATS ROSE YALE RYMAN & LEE PC

310 S St Mary'S Street Suite 1460

San Antonio, TX 78205

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER

1525 Mesa Verde Dr E #210

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

17901 Von Karman Ave. Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

Other Attorneys

BULLARD BROWN & BEAL LLP

3890 11Th Street #111

Riverside, CA 92501

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEN & PHILLIPS

301 N. Lake Ave #410

Pasadena, CA 91101

LAW OFFICES OF MARK J SKAPIK

250 W. First St. Ste. 330

Claremont, CA 91711

HINES SMITH CARDER

3090 Bristol St #540

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN O'MEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

JEFFREY & GROSFELDLLP

725 Town & Country Road Suite 210

Orange, CA 92868

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY NTHOMPSON

6745 S. Washington Ave #330

Whittier, CA 90601

JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

14724 Ventura Blvd Suite 1210

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614

SELMAN BREITMAN

6 Hutton Centre Drive Ste 1100

Santa Ana, CA 92707

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

1980 Orange Tree Ln Suite 106

Redlands, CA 92374

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON D-BEST TUBS/SHOWERSINSTALLATIONS, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/28/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON ALLIANCE MECHANICALAND HEATINGAND AIR CON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/29/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON T MCGEE ELECTRIC, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/29/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON TOMKINS INDUSTRIES,INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/29/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON SILVERADO PLASTERING, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/05/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING,INC. REPRESENTED BY HINES SMITH CARDER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2008 OF PRECISE GRADE, INC AND FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEMURRER

NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION SERVED ON MARSHALL INSTALLATION S & WEATHERSTRIP, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/16/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2008 OF J.T. TILE & MARBLE,INC AS TO PULTE HOME CORPORATION FILED.

NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE O

NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION BY AAA GLASS REPRESENTED BY STEWART & EUM

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION BY FENCEWORKS INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT AAA GLASS ADDING ATTORNEY BULLARD BROWN & BEAL LLP FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AS TO MESA GARAGE DOORS FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY WALLDE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY WALLDESIGN INCORPORATED FILED.

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SET

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WALLDESIGN INCORPORATED.

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SET

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MERILLAT CORPORATION.

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON 7/13/10 BY DEFENDANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • --ALSO ASSOCIATE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2008 OF J.T. TILE & MARBLE,INC LEE BAZZO & NISHI FOR J.T. TILE & MARBLE,INC--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. TILE & MARBLE,INC ADDING ATTORNEY LEE BAZZO & NISHI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LUIS VIDAL FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED REGARDING CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2007 OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION AND MERILLAT CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LUIS VIDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LUIS VIDAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LUIS VIDAL FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2007 OF LUIS VIDAL SERVED ON PULTE HOME CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/06/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/08/08 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • CERT FAX FILED BY WILLIAM M SICKINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERILLAT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PRECISE GRADE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROSS STATE ELECTRIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALARCON SONS INC is a litigant