This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 13:16:53 (UTC).

VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC VS BUSTAMANTE INVESTMEN

Case Summary

On 06/03/2013 VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUSTAMANTE INVESTMEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6570

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC

Defendants

ALICE MORENO NAVARRO

BUSTAMANTE INVESTMENTS INC

RBP-RIVERSIDE PLAZA INC

AMAL MEHTA

MINAXI PATEL

DINESH PATEL

LALITA PATEL

ARNOLDO H RESENDEZ

BLANCA RESENDEZ

CARLOS SOLORZANO NAVARRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER, LLP

13215 E Penn Street Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PAUL E. ANTILL

425 W. Bonita Ave Suite 207

San Dimas, CA 91773

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON DINESH PATEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON LALITA PATEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON BUSTAMANTE INVESTMENTS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON BLANCA RESENDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC AS TO RBP-RIVERSIDE PLAZAINC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC AS TO AMAL MEHTA; MAILING DATE OF 08/12/13 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC AS TO MINAXI PATEL; MAILING DATE OF 08/12/13 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC AS TO AMAL MEHTA, MINAXI PATEL, DINESH PATEL, LALITA PATEL FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC BY CARLOS SOLORZANO NAVARRO, ALICE MORENO NAVARRO REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF PAULE. ANTILL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC AS TO BUSTAMANTE INVESTMENTS INC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY V

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON ARNOLDO H RESENDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/17/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAG

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - BY VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC FILED.

ORDER FOR OF DISMISSAL IS GRA

ORDER FOR OF DISMISSAL IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR OF DISMISSAL IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC AS TO RBP-RIVERSIDE PLAZAINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON BLANCA RESENDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON BUSTAMANTE INVESTMENTS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/02/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON LALITA PATEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC SERVED ON DINESH PATEL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/03/2013 OF VESTAR RIVERSIDE PLAZA LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92506.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less