This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 11:51:06 (UTC).

VASQUEZ VS KAWANANAKOA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 VASQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAWANANAKOA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0461

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

DIONICIO VASQUEZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

DAVIS WOJCIK DUARTE APLC

1001 E Morton Pl, Ste A

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIANLLP

100 Spectrum Center Dr #600

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2017 OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA REPRESENTED BY SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIANLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ABIGAIL KAW

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA REPRESENTED BY SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIANLLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA AND FILED.

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIONI

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMP/1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPL IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE RAQUEL A MARQUEZ.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ SERVED ON ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/02/17 FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA SERVED ON DIONICIO VASQUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/25/17 FILED

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS CO

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ REPRESENTED BY DAVIS WOJCIK DUARTEAPLC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA REPRESENTED BY SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIANLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2017 OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DP

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DPET ASSIGNMENT AND CMC HEARING.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FAX FILING BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2017 OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA REPRESENTED BY SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIANLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2017 OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ AS TO ABIGAIL KAWANANAKOA; MAILING DATE OF 05/21/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FAX FILING BY DIONICIO VASQUEZ ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DPET ASSIGNMENT AND CMC HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/07/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2017 OF DIONICIO VASQUEZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less