This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/17/2018 at 11:17:55 (UTC).

VARGAS VS SANTANA

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 VARGAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SANTANA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5901

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUGO VARGAS

IRMA LOPEZ

Defendant

PEDRO SANTANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPECKMAN LAW FIRM

1350 Columbia St., Ste. 503

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS

721 Third Ave

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO 7/30/1

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO 7/30/18 HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAG

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SERVED ON LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND M CONTRERAS SERVED 02/26/18 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY H

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY HUGO VARGAS, IRMA LOPEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANA

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNS

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PEDRO SANTANA BYLAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS FILED (FORM MC-051).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTO

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR PEDRO SANTANA BY LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS FILED

DECLARATION OF RAYMOND M CONTR

DECLARATION OF RAYMOND M CONTRERAS FILED

MINUTE ORDER: ON COURTS OWN MT

MINUTE ORDER: ON COURTS OWN MTN RE: CHANGES TO 2-27-18

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2017 OF HUGO VARGAS AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2017 OF HUGO VARGAS SERVED ON PEDRO SANTANA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2017 OF HUGO VARGAS AS TO PEDRO SANTANA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 05/25/17

DECLARATION OF RAYMOND CONTRER

DECLARATION OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMP

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY HUGO VARGAS, IRMA LOPEZ FILED

ORDER SUSTAINING/OVERRULE DEFS

ORDER SUSTAINING/OVERRULE DEFS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HUGO VARGAS, IRMA LOPEZ

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HUGO

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HUGO VARGAS FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • COURT TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • SANCTIONS PAID BY LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS ATTORNEY FOR PEDRO SANTANA IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • PEDRO SANTANA/LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FTA 6/13/18 & NO PROOF AS TO MTN TO WITHDRAW.; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO 7/30/18 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY. ATTORNEY IS RELIEVED AS COUNSEL EFFECTIVE: UPON FILING OF P.O.S. OF SIGNED ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD - RES75287; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PEDRO SANTANA BY LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND CONTRERAS; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • POS TIMELY/WAIVED - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ON CALENDAR 04/16/18 IS TIMELY/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RAYMOND M CONTRERAS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY PEDRO SANTANA (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY PEDRO SANTANA DBA BURRITOS SANTANA IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR DEMURRER ON 08/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2017 OF HUGO VARGAS AS TO PEDRO SANTANA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 05/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2017 OF HUGO VARGAS SERVED ON PEDRO SANTANA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/07/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2017 OF HUGO VARGAS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less