Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 19:19:01 (UTC).

VALENCIA VS S EARTHMAN

Case Summary

On 09/01/2011 VALENCIA filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against S EARTHMAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0263

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

DANIEL VALENCIA

Corcoran, CA 93212

Defendant and Respondent

S EARTHMAN CORRECTIONAL OFFICER (ISP)

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

110 West A Street Suite 1100 P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92101

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL

110 West A Street #1100 Po Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92101

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2011 OF DANIEL VALENCIA AND FILED.

LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VA

LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VALENCIA RE: EXTENSION AND FILED

LETTER RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF

LETTER RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF RE: REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE ON OSC AND FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER OF A

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL FEES FILED BY DANIEL VALENCIA IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.

REQUEST EXTENSION OF TIME TO C

REQUEST EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE SHERIFF SERVICE BY DANIEL VALENCIA H73555 FILED.

LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VA

LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VALENCIA H73555 RE: PROOF OF SERVICE AND FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2011 OF DANIEL VALENCIA BY S EARTHMAN CORRECTIONAL OFFICER(ISP) REPRESENTED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIAATTORNEY GENERAL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARA

REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY DANIEL VALENCIA H73555 FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY S EARTHMAN CORRECTIONAL OFFICER(ISP)

LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VA

LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VALENCIA RE: REQUESTING FORMS AND FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY S EARTHMAN CORRECTIONAL OFFICER(ISP)

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY S. EARTHMAN.

OBJECTIONS TO MOTION TO REPLY

OBJECTIONS TO MOTION TO REPLY ON DEFENDANTS MOTION DENYING ALL CHARGES BY DANIEL G VALENCIA FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: FEBRUARY

NOTICE OF RULING RE: FEBRUARY 22 2013 FILED

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL.

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED.

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEA

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED; JUSTICE RAMIREZ, NONE, NONE.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2013
  • WAIVER PAYMENT PLAN: PARTIAL PAYMENT OF FILING FEES PAID BY DANIEL VALENCIA IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00 (COMPLAINT - OVER $25,000).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED; JUSTICE RAMIREZ, NONE, NONE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL NUMBER ISSUED E058332

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - NTC OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: NOTICE OF DEFAULT RE: DEPOSIT ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: MOTION FOR CONSIDERING EVIDENCE FOR FILING SUBMITTED BY DANIEL VALENCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR COURT FILED BY DANIEL VALENCIA, ORDER/JUDGMENT DATE AND/OR REASON FOR APPEAL NOT SPECIFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • CONFIDENTIAL FILING: JUDGES NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER RECEIVED FROM DANIEL VALENCIA RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY DANIEL VALENCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - BLYTHE; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • BLYTHE NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF INMATE DANIEL VALENCIA FOR COURT FILING FEE(S) - WAIVER DENIED ; HONORABLE JUDGE B J BJORK.; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2011 OF DANIEL VALENCIA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DANIEL VALENCIA (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less