This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 11:56:33 (UTC).

UZOR V WALKER

Case Summary

On 03/10/2014 UZOR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0521

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NNAMDI UZOR

Defendant

ROBERT WALKER

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, VIC

225 South Lake Ave #300

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92532.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2014 OF NNAMDI UZOR AS TO ROBERT WALKER WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/19/14

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2014 OF NNAMDI UZOR AS TO ROBERT WALKER, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2014 OF NNAMDI UZOR AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/19/14.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/09/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY NNAMDI UZOR.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY NNAMDI UZOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/09/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2014 OF NNAMDI UZOR AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/19/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2014 OF NNAMDI UZOR AS TO ROBERT WALKER, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2014 OF NNAMDI UZOR AS TO ROBERT WALKER WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/19/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTICE OF FILING UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO ROBERT WALKER; REASON RETURNED: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTICE OF FILING UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO ALL UNKNOWNS; REASON RETURNED: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY NNAMDI UZOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92532.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/09/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less