This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 00:08:59 (UTC).

U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP vs GLENROY COACHELLA LLC

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 U S REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLENROY COACHELLA LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KIRA L KLATCHKO, JACKSON LUCKY, LUCKY, RANDALL D WHITE, SUNSHINE S SYKES, Sharon J. Waters, Sunshine Sykes and L. Jackson Lucky IV. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5743

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

KIRA L KLATCHKO

JACKSON LUCKY

LUCKY

RANDALL D WHITE

SUNSHINE S SYKES

Sharon J. Waters

Sunshine Sykes

L. Jackson Lucky IV

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC

TANDEM WEST GLASS INC

APPLE J PLUMBING INC

BLAIR AIR INC

DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC

TEMALPAKH INC

BMC WEST LLC

AL MILLER & SONS ROOFING CO INC

GLENROY COACHELLA LLC

FORCE RUBIN 2 LLC

FORCE RUBIN LLC

QUONSET PARTNERS LLC

SYSTEMS WATERPROOFING INC

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

GF INVESTMENT GROUP INC

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC S HOMME A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

Attorney at MARC S HOMME A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

74361 Highway 111 #12 Po Box 4250

Palm Desert, CA 92261

ROEMER & HARNIK LLP

Attorney at ROEMER & HARNIK LLP

45025 Manitou Drive

Indian Wells, CA 92210

ABDULAZIZ, GROSSBART & RUDMAN

Attorney at ABDULAZIZ, GROSSBART & RUDMAN

6454 Coldwater Canyon Ave

North Hollywood, CA 91606-1187

GEORGE SYKULSKI A PROF LAW CORP

Attorney at GEORGE SYKULSKI A PROF LAW CORP

Post Office Box 10426

Burbank, CA 91510

PLUMTREE & ASSOCIATES

Attorney at PLUMTREE & ASSOCIATES

11132 Winners Circle Ste G-207

Los Alamitos, CA 90720

Other Attorneys

LANAK & HANNA PC

Attorney at LANAK & HANNA PC

625 The City Drive South Suite 190

Orange, CA 92868

WCH LAW GROUP, P.C.

Attorney at WCH LAW GROUP, P.C.

625 The City Dr. South #325

Orange, CA 92868

THE GREEN LAW GROUP, LLP

Attorney at THE GREEN LAW GROUP, LLP

1777 E. Los Angeles Ave

Simi Valley, CA 93065

RAINES FELDMAN LLP

Attorney at RAINES FELDMAN LLP

18401 Von Karman Ave Ste 360

Irvine, CA 92612

KOZBERG & BODELL LLP

Attorney at KOZBERG & BODELL LLP

1801 Century Park East 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP by APPLE J PLUMBING INC represented by ROVER ARMSTRONG filed. (Over $25,000.00)

01/31/2020: Answer to Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP by APPLE J PLUMBING INC represented by ROVER ARMSTRONG filed. (Over $25,000.00)

STUART RUBIN'S MPA'S AND OPPO TO PLTFS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FILED

02/25/2020: STUART RUBIN'S MPA'S AND OPPO TO PLTFS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FILED

Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

08/30/2021: Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

08/04/2021: Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Minute Order: Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP by FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

04/13/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP by FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

Joint Stipulation and Order for Continued Hearing

04/08/2021: Joint Stipulation and Order for Continued Hearing

Defendant A. Stuart Rubin's Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of the fifth cause of action for breach of indemnity and guarantee agreement filed by U.S. Real Estate Credit Holdings III-A, LP

04/06/2021: Defendant A. Stuart Rubin's Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of the fifth cause of action for breach of indemnity and guarantee agreement filed by U.S. Real Estate Credit Holdings III-A, LP

Declaration of A. Stuart Rubin in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of fifth cause of action for breach indemnity and guaranty agreement

04/06/2021: Declaration of A. Stuart Rubin in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of fifth cause of action for breach indemnity and guaranty agreement

Defendant Stuart Rubin's Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth Cause of Action for breach of indemnity and guaranty agreement on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

04/06/2021: Defendant Stuart Rubin's Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth Cause of Action for breach of indemnity and guaranty agreement on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

Defendant Elliot Lander's Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication on Fifth Cause of Action for breach of indemnity and guaranty agreement on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

04/06/2021: Defendant Elliot Lander's Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication on Fifth Cause of Action for breach of indemnity and guaranty agreement on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

Defendant Elliot Lander's Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication on Fifth Cause of Action for breach of indemnity and guarantee agreement filed by U.S. Real Estate Credit Holdings III-A, LP

04/06/2021: Defendant Elliot Lander's Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication on Fifth Cause of Action for breach of indemnity and guarantee agreement filed by U.S. Real Estate Credit Holdings III-A, LP

Declaration of A. Stuart Rubin in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth of Cause of Action for Breach Indemnity and Guaranty Agreement

04/06/2021: Declaration of A. Stuart Rubin in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth of Cause of Action for Breach Indemnity and Guaranty Agreement

Declaration of Marvin H. Weiss in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth Cause of Action for Breach Indemnity and Guaranty agreement

04/06/2021: Declaration of Marvin H. Weiss in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fifth Cause of Action for Breach Indemnity and Guaranty agreement

Declaration of Elliot Lander in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of fifth cause of action for breach indemnity and guaranty agreement

04/06/2021: Declaration of Elliot Lander in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication of fifth cause of action for breach indemnity and guaranty agreement

Proof of Service

04/06/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/05/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Reply Plaintiff U.S. Real Estate Credit Holdings III-A, L.P.'s Reply in Support of Ex Parte Application to Advance Case Management Conference for Purposes of Determining Impact of Bankruptcy Automatic Stay on These Proceedings

04/05/2021: Reply Plaintiff U.S. Real Estate Credit Holdings III-A, L.P.'s Reply in Support of Ex Parte Application to Advance Case Management Conference for Purposes of Determining Impact of Bankruptcy Automatic Stay on These Proceedings

Opposition to ex parte application to advance case management conference for purposes of determining impact of bankruptcy automatic stay on these proceednings

04/02/2021: Opposition to ex parte application to advance case management conference for purposes of determining impact of bankruptcy automatic stay on these proceednings

1,999 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2025
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c).; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP by FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingType: Motion for Summary Adjudication of the Fifth Cause of Action for Breach of Indemnity and Guaranty Agreement; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing Re: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingType: OSC re: Dismissal of any party not At-Issue.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication on Complaint of U.S. REAL ESTATE CREDIT HOLDINGS III A LP by FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,509 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Consolidated Complaint of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92236.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT FOR LAW AND MTN PRUPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Consolidated Complaint from Case # PSC1906023 filed on 1st Amended Consolidated Complaint of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92236.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Consolidated Complaint from Case # PSC1906015 filed on Consolidated Complaint of SUPERIOR READY MIX CONCRETE LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketFilings: Consolidated Complaint of DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less