Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 09:02:35 (UTC).

US BANK VS IGLESIAS

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 US BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IGLESIAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0147

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendants

LETICIA CHAVARRIA

NARCISO IGLESIAS

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAIMAN LAW GROUP

4660 La Jolla Village Drive Suite 850

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorney

SAUNDERS, GARY

1891 California Ave Suite 102

Corona, CA 92882

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92596.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA BY LETICIA CHAVARRIA REPRESENTED BY GARY SAUNDERS FILED. (10,000.00 AND UNDER)

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMUR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER SERVED ON GARY SAUNDERS,ESQ SERVED 03/01/16 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY LETI

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY LETICIA CHAVARRIA FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/24/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO LETICIA CHAVARRIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/24/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA AS TO NARCISO IGLESIAS, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/18/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA BY LETICIA CHAVARRIA REPRESENTED BY GARY SAUNDERS FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC FIALURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES - UD.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/19/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2016
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/19/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC FIALURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES - UD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 8/19/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA BY LETICIA CHAVARRIA REPRESENTED BY GARY SAUNDERS FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/18/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2016 OF US BANK TRUST NA BY LETICIA CHAVARRIA; Disposition: Court's ruling on demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY US BANK TRUST NA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/25/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92596.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant