Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/02/2016 at 00:17:05 (UTC).

US BANK VS GREEFIELD

Case Summary

On 10/06/2014 US BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GREEFIELD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2365

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST

Defendant

KEVIN L GREENFIELD

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TFLG A LAW CORPORATION

202 Cousteau Place, Ste. 260

Davis, CA 95618

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2014 OF US BANK TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO KEVIN L GREENFIELD BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 11/03/14.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2014 OF US BANK TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 11/03/14.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2014 OF US BANK TRUST AS TO KEVIN L GREENFIELD, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/25/14

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY US BANK TRUST.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY US BANK TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2014 OF US BANK TRUST AS TO KEVIN L GREENFIELD, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2014 OF US BANK TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 11/03/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2014 OF US BANK TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO KEVIN L GREENFIELD BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 11/03/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY US BANK TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/05/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant