This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 14:09:31 (UTC).

U.S. BANK VS BAKER

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 U S BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BAKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0837

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BRIAN C BAKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DEMURR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DEMURRER BY U.S. BANK FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BRIAN C BAKER IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK BY BRIAN C BAKER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (10,000.00 AND UNDER)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketHEARING ON DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK BY BRIAN C BAKER; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BRIAN C BAKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/23/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DEMURRER BY U.S. BANK FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING BY U.S. BANK ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BRIAN C BAKER IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR BRIAN C BAKER WAS GRANTED FOR DEMURRER; $255.00 WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK BY BRIAN C BAKER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (10,000.00 AND UNDER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING BY U.S. BANK ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 7/12/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2016 OF U.S. BANK AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less