This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/17/2018 at 15:14:36 (UTC).

UNITED RENTALS VS GILMORE

Case Summary

On 02/04/2002 UNITED RENTALS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILMORE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8159

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED RENTALS INC.

Defendants

MICHAEL GILMORE

MICHELLE GILMORE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RI

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RIVERSIDE(UNSATISFIED) COUNTY

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR LOST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR LOST WRIT FILED

MEMO OF CREDITS OF $$70.46, AC

MEMO OF CREDITS OF $$70.46, ACCRUED INTEREST OF $$0.00 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $$0.00 FILED.

DECLARATION OF RE: WRIT OF EXE

DECLARATION OF RE: WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REIS

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF NEW WRIT GRANTED BY UNITED RENTALS INC. FILED; HONORABLE PRO TEM MARLENE ALLEN.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA;

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - CORONA FILED 02/04/2002 OF UNITED RENTALS INC. AS TO MICHAEL GILMORE, MAILING DATE OF 06/29/02 FILED. COSTS OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - CORONA FILED 02/04/2002 OF UNITED RENTALS INC. AS TO MICHELLE GILMORE, MAILING DATE OF 06/29/02 FILED. COSTS OF $35.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FIL

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; RIVERSIDE(UNSATISFIED) COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2003
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR LOST WRIT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF CREDITS OF $$70.46, ACCRUED INTEREST OF $$0.00 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $$0.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF RE: WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2003
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2003
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: MEMO OF COSTS/WRIT OF EXECUTION SUBMITTED BY UNITED RENTALS INC..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF NEW WRIT GRANTED BY UNITED RENTALS INC. FILED; HONORABLE PRO TEM MARLENE ALLEN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2003
  • DocketDECLARATION RE LOST ORIG WRIT REC'D & FORWD TO DEPT. C2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2003
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: DECL SUBMITTED BY UNITED RENTALS INC..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2002
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND MINUTE ORDER; REASON - FORWARD TIME EXPIRED, AS TO MICHELLE GILMORE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 4/23/02 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. C3 - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2002
  • DocketCLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2002
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED - CORONA (NOT USED SINCE 2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 3/14/02 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. C3 - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Rentals, Inc, is a litigant