This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2018 at 13:27:24 (UTC).

UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES VS WASYL KORZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2006 UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WASYL KORZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0202

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC

SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN

344 East Seventh Street

San Jacinto, CA 92583

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WASYL KORZ

GEORGE KORZ

OLGA KORZ

STEVEN MATTHEW DI MEMMO

San Jacinto, CA 92583

SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN

344 East Seventh Street

San Jacinto, CA 92583

MILTON AGUILES ROCA

San Jacinto, CA 92583

STEVEN MATTHEW DI MEMO

San Jacinto, CA 92583

SUE ALL OF THE KORZ

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EUGENE C MOORE

2629 Foothill Blvd #223

La Crescenta, CA 91214

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN & NATHANSON

9454 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 820

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2929

Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AARON F GARCIA

71780 San Jacinto Dr #J

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC (COMPLAINT) BY GEORGE KORZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/28/06 FILED

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC (COMPLAINT) BY OLGA KORZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/28/06 FILED

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC (COMPLAINT) BY WASYL KORZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/28/06 FILED

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WASYL KORZ,

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WASYL KORZ, OLGA KORZ, GEORGE KORZ REPRESENTED BY SHERMAN & NATHANSON FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC BY WASYL KORZ, OLGA KORZ, GEORGE KORZ REPRESENTED BY SHERMAN & NATHANSON FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT FIL

SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/01/2006 OF WASYL KORZ FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/01/2006 OF WASYL KORZ SERVED ON AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/27/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY U

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC, SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY W

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY WASYL KORZ, OLGA KORZ, GEORGE KORZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN, MILTON AGUILES ROCA, STEVEN MATTHEW DI MEMO FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/01/2006 OF WASYL KORZ AS TO STEVEN MATTHEW DI MEMO; MAILING DATE OF 12/20/06 FILED.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/01/2006 OF WASYL KORZ AS TO MILTON AGUILES ROCA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 01/19/07

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MILTON AGUI

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MILTON AGUILES ROCA, STEVEN MATTHEW DI MEMO REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF AARON F GARCIA FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/01/2006 OF WASYL KORZ BY MILTON AGUILES ROCA, AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF AARON F GARCIA FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2008
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FILED. REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF AARON F GARCIA FOR PARTY SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER (FORM MC-053).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN BY LAW OFFICES OF AARON F GARCIA; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • REQ FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL BY UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC, SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • HEARING ON OSC RE SANCTIONS AND/OR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC AGAINST UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC, SOUTHWEST CONTRACTORS AN UNINCORPORATED GEN, WASYL KORZ, OLGA KORZ, GEORGE KORZ FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 8/3/07.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2006
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC (COMPLAINT) BY WASYL KORZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/28/06 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC (COMPLAINT) BY OLGA KORZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/28/06 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2006 OF UNITED MERCHANT SERVCIES INC (COMPLAINT) BY GEORGE KORZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/28/06 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2006
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2006
  • FAX FEE PAID FOR NEW COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Merchant Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant