Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 13:34:13 (UTC).

UNIFUND VS WALKER

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 UNIFUND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3373

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

DREW WALKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

Attorney at KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

Judgment on Stipulation on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

01/21/2021: Judgment on Stipulation on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order/Jdgmt.

10/09/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order/Jdgmt.

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed

10/05/2020: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed.

10/05/2020: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC served on DREW WALKER with service date of 08/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

08/21/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC served on DREW WALKER with service date of 08/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/21/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92586.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92586.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC and filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC; For/Against: For - UNIFUND CCR, LLC Against - DREW WALKER; Details; Principal: $7,974.61; Costs: $595.00; Attorney Fees: $1,496.00; Subtotal Judgment: $10,065.61; Total: $10,065.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment on Stipulation on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Judgment by Court on Stipulation on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC; Filed By: UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order/Jdgmt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $74.00; Paid: $74.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV201006-0130-V.1; Paid: $74.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $181.00; Paid: $181.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2020; Fine Description: Check #9324 Receipt No.: CV201006-0129-CK.1; Paid: $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC served on DREW WALKER with service date of 08/15/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Check #30534 Receipt No.: CV200721-0044-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92586.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant