Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 12:22:22 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 UNIFUND CCR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3353

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

BREANNE D GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GURSTEL LAW FIRM PC

Attorney at GURSTEL LAW FIRM PC

9320 East Raintree Drive

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail re: Request for Dismissal on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

05/20/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Request for Dismissal on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Request for Dismissal

05/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration re Non Service of Summons and Complaint on BREANNE D GOMEZ filed

10/21/2020: Declaration re Non Service of Summons and Complaint on BREANNE D GOMEZ filed

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

Declaration of /in Support of Reduced Filing Fee filed

07/20/2020: Declaration of /in Support of Reduced Filing Fee filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: Request for Dismissal on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re Non Service of Summons and Complaint on BREANNE D GOMEZ filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #3703 Receipt No.: CV200720-0375-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of /in Support of Reduced Filing Fee filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of UNIFUND CCR, LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 05/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant