This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 16:29:40 (UTC).

TRUJILLO VS CELCO CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 TRUJILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CELCO CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4750

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Minors and Cross Defendants

LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF

STEPHANIE AGUILAR

KEVIN AGUILAR

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CELCO CONSTRUCTIONCOMPANY INC

CELIN CORTES

ALONSO ESTRADA

BTEC INC

US ENERGY LIGHTINGSERVICES LLC

KX2 HOLDINGS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES GROUP LP

PALM SPRINGS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

US ENERGY SERVICESINC

U.S. ENERGY SERVICES INC

KEVIN AGUILAR

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KX2 HOLDINGS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES GROUP LP

PALM SPRINGS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

U.S. ENERGY SERVICES INC

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

PROFESSIONAL LAWYERS GROUP

1300 North Mountain View

San Bernardino, CA 92405

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL LAW CORPORATION

6242 Westchester Parkway #200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

WINGERT GREBING BRUBAKER & JUSKIE LLP

One America Plaza 7Th Floor 600 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101-3370

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

WEINSTEIN, MARK A

700 S. Flower Street Suite 220

Los Angeles, CA 90017

VEATCH CARLSON

1055 Wilshire Blvd 11Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

VEATCH-CARLSON

700 South Flower Street Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/11/16.

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUING MOTIO

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE CONTINUNACE OF DEFENDAN

NOTICE CONTINUNACE OF DEFENDANT BTRC INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CELCO CONSTRUCTIONCOMPANY INC, CELIN CORTES, ALONSO ESTRADA, BTEC INC FILED.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/05/2014 OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF BY CELCO CONSTRUCTIONCOMPANY INC, CELIN CORTES, ALONSO ESTRADA REPRESENTED BY HALL LAW CORPORATION FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CELCO

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CELCO CONSTRUCTION/CORTES/ESTRADAS MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLAINTIFFS FILED

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LOREN

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF F

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY CELCO CONSTRUCTIONCOMPANY INC, CELIN CORTES, ALONSO ESTRADA, BTEC INC FILED

REPLY TO PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO

REPLY TO PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY CELCO CONSTRUCTIONCOMPANY INC, CELIN CORTES, ALONSO ESTRADA, BTEC INC FILED

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLI RAINES

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLI RAINES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DE

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KX2 HOLDINGS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES GROUP LP FILED.

3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LOREN

3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF BY KX2 HOLDINGS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES GROUP LP REPRESENTED BY TYSON & MENDES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY FOR PALM SPRINGS UNIFIED SCHOOL FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY US ENERGY SERVICESINC.

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF BY US ENERGY SERVICESINC REPRESENTED BY WINGERT GREBING BRUBAKER & JUSKIE LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF /IN SUPP

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF /IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALT SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY PALM SPRINGS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT.

FILED: 2ND DECLARATION OF WILL

FILED: 2ND DECLARATION OF WILLIAM A SKOOG JR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDMENTS TO OPPOSITION

202 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (ENTIRE ACTION) SUBMITTED BY LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED) BY PLAINTIFFS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2015 OF U.S. ENERGY SERVICES INC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • FAX FILING BY U.S. ENERGY SERVICES INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • --ALSO DISMISS CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/19/2014 OF PALM SPRINGS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT WITH PREJUDICE--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR CONTINUING OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

    Read MoreRead Less
375 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/05/2014 OF LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO AND ON BEHALF OF (COMPLAINT) BY CELIN CORTES WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/08/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • HEARING RESERVED SET 12/11/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 12/11/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • UPDATE PARTY KEVIN AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF STEPHANIE AGUILAR NAMED AS LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF KEVIN AGUILAR NAMED AS LORENA GUZMAN TRUJILLO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less