This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 12:03:32 (UTC).

TRHROCKMORTON VS STEINHILBER

Case Summary

On 03/11/2014 TRHROCKMORTON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STEINHILBER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0536

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANN M THROCKMORTON, HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T

Defendants

JAY DAVID STEINHILBER

TIMOTHY WILLIAMS

Temecula, CA 92592

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T FILED BY TIMOTHY WILLIAMS ON 03/20/14

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY TIMOTHY WILLIAMS IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T BY TIMOTHY WILLIAMS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO JAY DAVID STEINHILBER; AND MAILED ON 03/13/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/11/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T AS TO JAY DAVID STEINHILBER, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T.

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONOR

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/15/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/15/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSA; - AS TO JAY DAVID STEINHILBER.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 4/18/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T DEEMED SERVED ON TIMOTHY WILLIAMS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/20/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/11/2014 OF ANN M THROCKMORTON,HAROLD L THROCKMORTON T FILED BY TIMOTHY WILLIAMS ON 03/20/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/16/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less