This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 16:28:24 (UTC).

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY VS. SORRELL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2014 TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SORRELL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8404

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA

DARLENE KELLER

WAYNE KELLER

STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

PAUL SORRELL

LINDA SORRELL

ELITE PAINTERS

JOHNNY GUZMAN

RICHARD DALE HALLEM

OMAR GARCIA

PAUL AND LINDA SORRELL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

JENNIFER RODELA

Not Classified By Court, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RIC1514258

RICHARD DALE HALLEM

DOES 5 THROUGH 25

RIC1410236

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLAUSEN MILLER PC

17901 Von Karman #650

Irvine, CA 92614

THE LAW OFFICES OFKENNETH STEVAN BURGI

15 Corporate Plaza Suite 250

Newport Beach, CA 92660

GROTEFELD HOFFMANN

655 Montgomery St, Ste 1220

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER& LOWARY

3890 Tenth St 2Nd Flr

Riverside, CA 92501

POLLAK VIDA & FISHER

11150 West Olympic Blvd Suite 980

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1815

FOWLER LAW GROUP

11845 West Olympic Blvd Suite 710

Los Angeles, CA 90064

LAW OFFICE OF ESTEFAN M ENCARNACION

10601 Civic Center Dr, Ste 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO PAUL SORRELL, LINDA SORRELL, RICHARD DALE HALLEM, OMAR GARCIA FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RICHARD DAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RICHARD DALE HALLEM REPRESENTED BY FOWLER LAW GROUP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RIC1408

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RIC1408404 BY RICHARD DALE HALLEM FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR CONSOLIDATE ACTI

MOTION TO/FOR CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS BY RICHARD DALE HALLEM FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DARLENE KELLER, WAYNE KELLER

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF RICHARD HALLEM FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF RICHARD HALLEM FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPL

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA NAMING DOES 1 TO BE RICHARD DALE HALLEM FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92505.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONS

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

REGISTER OF ACTIONS ON RIC1514

REGISTER OF ACTIONS ON RIC1514258 THROUGH 02/29/16

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DARLENE KELLER, WAYNE KELLER

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DARLENE KELLER, WAYNE KELLER.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SET

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/10/2014 OF PAUL SORRELL AS TO JOHNNY GUZMAN FILED.

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE AT OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT BY TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA AS TO OMAR GARCIA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2015 OF STATE FARM GENERALINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO PAUL SORRELL, LINDA SORRELL, RICHARD DALE HALLEM, OMAR GARCIA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • FAX FILING BY DARLENE KELLER, WAYNE KELLER ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 2ND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF DARLENE KELLER FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2014
  • FAX FILING BY PAUL SORRELL, LINDA SORRELL ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PAUL SORRELL REPRESENTED BY POLLAK VIDA & FISHER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • FAX FILING BY PAUL SORRELL, LINDA SORRELL ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA BY PAUL SORRELL, LINDA SORRELL REPRESENTED BY POLLAK VIDA & FISHER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA AS TO PAUL SORRELL, LINDA SORRELL WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 09/24/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY AMERICA FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92505.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less