This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/11/2016 at 07:16:49 (UTC).

TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR VS CORPORATE CON

Case Summary

On 04/25/2011 TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORPORATE CON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7100

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR

AMERICAP CONSTRUCTION INC

CORPORATE CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS INC

MICHAEL A ARIZMENDI

CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC

JOSE L CHAVEZ

JOSE L SANCHEZ

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CORPORATE CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS INC

MICHAEL A ARIZMENDI

CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC

JOSE L CHAVEZ

JOSE L SANCHEZ

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC

JOSE L CHAVEZ

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

Not Classified By Court

RIC1107104 X COMPLAINT

XCOMPL RIC1107104

RIC1107104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave #200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ANAYA LAW GROUP

26135 Mureau Road Suite 203

Calabasas, CA 91302

LANAK & HANNA PC

625 The City Drive South Suite 190

Orange, CA 92868

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave #200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

ANAYA LAW GROUP

26135 Mureau Road Suite 203

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR SERVED ON JOSE L SANCHEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/09/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR SERVED ON CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/03/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR SERVED ON JOSE L CHAVEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/03/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPL

DEMURRER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR BY CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC, JOSE L CHAVEZ REPRESENTED BY ANAYA LAW GROUP FILED.

REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY

REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON CITYWIDE CONCRETE CO

1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPL

1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR, AMERICAP CONSTRUCTION INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC, JOSE L CHAVEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

REPLY TO OPPO OF DEMURRER TO T

REPLY TO OPPO OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC, JOSE L CHAVEZ FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC, JOSE L CHAVEZ

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/08/2011 OF CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC AS TO JOSE L SANCHEZ; MAILING DATE OF 02/01/12 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/08/2011 OF CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC AS TO JOSE L SANCHEZ FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED.

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/08/2011 OF CITYWIDE CONCRETE COMPANY INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • JT HEARING SET FOR 04/19/13 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NTC OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • MOTION HEARING RESERVATION MOTION TO BE RELIEVED SET FOR 05/02/12 AT 08:30 IS VACATED (MOVING PAPERS NOT FILED).

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR SERVED ON AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/06/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/25/11 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF TRACY ANTHONY GENERAL CONTRACTOR AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # RIC1107104 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less