This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 19:07:52 (UTC).

TORRES VS YORRIE

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 TORRES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YORRIE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1260

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORTENSIA E TORRES

Perris, CA 92570

Defendant

GINA YORRIE

Perris, CA 92570

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2017 OF HORTENSIA TORRES SERVED ON GINA YORRIE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/26/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY HORTENSIA E TORRES IS DEN; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2017 OF HORTENSIA TORRES BY GINA YORRIE REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GINA YORRIE IS GRA; CLERK P.THIPHAVONG (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HORTENSIA E TORRES - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL

REQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL) FOR HORTENSIA E TORRES.

DECLARATION OF HORTENSIA E TOR

DECLARATION OF HORTENSIA E TORRES FILED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY HORTENSIA E TORRES.

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/25/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSERVED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

AMENDED JUDGMENT TO UNLAWFUL D

AMENDED JUDGMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2017 OF HORTENSIA TORRES FILED 09/06/17; HONORABLE JUDGE DENNIS A MC CONAGHY.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2017 OF HORTENSIA TORRES FILED 09/06/17; HONORABLE JUDGE DENNIS A MC CONAGHY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSERVED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/25/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY HORTENSIA E TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 7/28/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWSW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY HORTENSIA E TORRES (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/25/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2017 OF HORTENSIA TORRES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less