This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 10:17:04 (UTC).

TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS CO VS HENRY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2013 TOKIO MARINE NICHIDO FIRE INS CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENRY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4470

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD

Defendants

REBECCA HENRY

LOREN HANSON

SHERRIE HANSON

CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA

2070 North Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

THE LAW OFFICES OFPATRICK MCDONOUGH

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

CHAMBERS NORONHA

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BECK & JENKINS, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

6830 Palm Drive

Riverside, CA 92506

DWAYNE S BECK

6830 Palm Ave

Riverside, CA 92506

Defendant Attorneys

CHAMBERS, NORONHA & KUBOTA

2070 N. Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

CHAMBERS NORONHA & KUBOTA

2070 North Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

DEMLER ARMSTRONG &ROWLAND LLP

4500 E Pacific Coast Highway Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3298

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

4500 E Pacific Coast Highway Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3298

ROPERS, MAJESKI, KOHN & BENTLEY

515 South Flower Street Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD AS TO CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA MAILING DATE OF 05/14/13 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD SERVED ON THE LAW OFFICES OFPATRICK MCDONOUGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/10/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD SERVED ON SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/13/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD BY REBECCA HENRY, LOREN HANSON, SHERRIE HANSON, CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA, THE LAW OFFICES OFPATRICK MCDONOUGH, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA REPRESENTED BY CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD REMOVE ATTORNEY CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA FOR PARTY(S) THE LAW OFFICES OFPATRICK MCDONOUGH AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY ROPERS, MAJESKI, KOHN & BENTLEY

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS REBECCA HE

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS REBECCA HENRYS DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED CMPL BY TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURR

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE BY THE LAW OFFICES OFPATRICK MCDONOUGH, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER FILED

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD BY REBECCA HENRY, CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA REPRESENTED BY CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE GRA, HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER R

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OF HENRY FOR SPECIAL INTERROGS BY TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED

OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MTN COMPEL

OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MTN COMPEL FURTHER RESP SPEC INTERROGS BY CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESP BY TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MTN FOR O

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MTN FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFT AND CONTINANCE FILED

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONA

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT ( FIRST FILED BY HARLAN B KISTLER (FORM ADR-100).

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD AS TO TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD CHANGE ATTORNEY BECK & JENKINS TO ATTORNEY DWAYNE S BECK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME BY TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL BY TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT/NONAGREEMENT DUE - CLERK'S CALENDAR.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • SANCC HEARING SET FOR 03/18/14 AT 08:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD SERVED ON SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/13/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD SERVED ON THE LAW OFFICES OFPATRICK MCDONOUGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/10/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD AS TO CHAMBERS NORONHA &KUBOTA MAILING DATE OF 05/14/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD AS TO LOREN HANSON; MAILING DATE OF 05/16/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD SERVED ON SHERRIE HANSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/15/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2013 OF TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INS. CO., LTD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less