Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 10:13:44 (UTC).

TODD vs ALAMO RENTAL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 TODD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALAMO RENTAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2320

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIDGETTE TODD

Defendants

ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC

ALAMO RENTAL

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

ALAMO RENTAL (US) LLC

MELISSA ANN MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

B & D LAW GROUP, APLC

Attorney at B & D LAW GROUP, APLC

10700 Santa Monica Blvd Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

05/26/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

Minute Order: BRIDGETTE TODD/B & D LAW GROUP, APLC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.

05/25/2021: Minute Order: BRIDGETTE TODD/B & D LAW GROUP, APLC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

05/25/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Plaintiff's response to order to show cause re failure to serve on Complaint of BRIDGETTE TODD

05/24/2021: Plaintiff's response to order to show cause re failure to serve on Complaint of BRIDGETTE TODD

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

03/18/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion continuance of hearing(s)

02/03/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion continuance of hearing(s)

Notice of related case

01/22/2021: Notice of related case

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

01/06/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion continuance of hearing(s)

12/23/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion continuance of hearing(s)

System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

10/26/2020: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

Case Management Statement filed by BRIDGETTE TODD

10/06/2020: Case Management Statement filed by BRIDGETTE TODD

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

07/06/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

06/01/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

06/01/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Why Not Consolidate RIC2002320 WITH RIC2001999 as to BRIDGETTE TODD; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingType: BRIDGETTE TODD/B & D LAW GROUP, APLC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: BRIDGETTE TODD/B & D LAW GROUP, APLC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's response to order to show cause re failure to serve on Complaint of BRIDGETTE TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingType: BRIDGETTE TODD/B & D LAW GROUP, APLC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement filed by BRIDGETTE TODD; Filed By: BRIDGETTE TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees Filed. Application filed by BRIDGETTE TODD on 06/01/20 is Granted by Operation of Law (FW-005).; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees filed by BRIDGETTE TODD (Form FW-001).; Filed By: BRIDGETTE TODD; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of TODD and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of BRIDGETTE TODD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMO RENTAL (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant