This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/14/2020 at 07:42:22 (UTC).

TLR ENTERPRISES vs DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 TLR ENTERPRISES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is L. JACKSON LUCKY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6552

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

L. JACKSON LUCKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC

Defendants

DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC

HY ROBIN FAULKNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GREEN LAW GROUP LLP

1777 E Los Angeles Avenue

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Defendant Attorney

ROVER ARMSTRONG APC

75100 Mediterranean

Palm Desert, CA 92211

 

Court Documents

COPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE P

COPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE PSC1906552; RIC1905743 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE L. JACKSON LUCKY.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC AS TO DEFENDANT DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC, GLENROY COACHELLA LLC, COACHELLA RESORT LLC, FORCE RUBIN LLC, FORCE RUBIN 2 LLC, QUONSET PARTNERS LLC, HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

FILED: WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY

FILED: WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT.

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 03/30/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO CONSOLID

NOTICE OF PETITION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED IN RELATED COURT BY DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC BY HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG APC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC BY DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC, HY ROBIN FAULKNER REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG APC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ON QUONSET PARTNERS LLC FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC BY GLENROY COACHELLA LLC, COACHELLA RESORT LLC, FORCE RUBIN LLC, FORCE RUBIN 2 LLC, QUONSET PARTNERS LLC REPRESENTED BY MCGARRIGLE KENNEY &ZAMPIELLO FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FI

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC BY DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC REPRESENTED BY MARC S HOMME A PROFESSIONAL LAWCORPORATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC SERVED ON FORCE RUBIN 2 LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/23/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ON QUONSET PARTNERS LLC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC SERVED ON DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/24/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC SERVED ON GLENROY COACHELLA LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/23/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC SERVED ON FORCE RUBIN LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/27/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (RECORDED COPY ATTACHED) BY T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2025
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2025
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC AS TO DEFENDANT DOUG WALL CONSTRUCTION INC, GLENROY COACHELLA LLC, COACHELLA RESORT LLC, FORCE RUBIN LLC, FORCE RUBIN 2 LLC, QUONSET PARTNERS LLC, HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket--AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC --

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE PSC1906552; RIC1905743 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE L. JACKSON LUCKY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY T.L.R. ENTERPRISES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE WITH NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC AS TO DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC WITH RECEIPT OF 09/20/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2019 OF T.L.R. ENTERPRISESINC AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/13/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92236.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC is a litigant