Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 02:13:25 (UTC).

TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA vs GASMI

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GASMI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0544

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

CHOKRI GASMI

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

ARBOR ONE ESCROW, INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHOKRI GASMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis Joseph Cunningham, III

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Brian John Wagner

Martin P Eramo

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Martin P Eramo

 

Court Documents

Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank Of New York As Successor To Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust Series 2005-K's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI

04/13/2021: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank Of New York As Successor To Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust Series 2005-K's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI

Disclaimer of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI

04/13/2021: Disclaimer of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

03/18/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

Cross-Complaint

03/18/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons Cross-Complaint

03/18/2021: Summons Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

02/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

Notice of deposit of interpleaded funds

02/16/2021: Notice of deposit of interpleaded funds

Disclaimer on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

01/28/2021: Disclaimer on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

Answer to Complaint In Interpleader on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

01/28/2021: Answer to Complaint In Interpleader on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

12/29/2020: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

12/11/2020: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/11/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

12/11/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Disclaimer of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI; Filed By: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank Of New York As Successor To Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust Series 2005-K's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI; Filed By: REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5001 Receipt No.: 20210329-00405.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: CHOKRI GASMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA; Filed By: CHOKRI GASMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFilings: Cross-Complaint of CHOKRI GASMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA; Filed By: TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $900.00; Paid: $900.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/18/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2646 Receipt No.: 20210218-00468.1; Paid: $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint In Interpleader on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA; Filed By: REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Disclaimer on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA; Filed By: REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/29/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *2126 Receipt No.: 20201229-00463.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TICOR TITLE COMPAY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant