This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 07:08:52 (UTC).

THOMASON vs KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 THOMASON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jackson Lucky and Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1615

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jackson Lucky

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BONNIE B THOMASON

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

EMPIRE FLOOR COVERING INC

PETE ROSAS

RICHARD GONSALVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARY G. GOLDBERG

GOLDBERG, GARY G.

3673 Arlington Ave.

Riverside, CA 92506

Defendant Attorneys

ELIZABETH A. FLATLEY

FLATLEY, ELIZABETH A.

2677 N. Main Street, Ste 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Evan Andrew Berman

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

08/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

07/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Gary G. Goldberg re: Moving Up Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Order (Denied)

06/08/2021: Gary G. Goldberg re: Moving Up Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Order (Denied)

Plaintiffs Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel further responses to request for production of documents. set one

05/12/2021: Plaintiffs Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel further responses to request for production of documents. set one

Delaration of Gary G. Goldberg re First Amended and Second Amended Case Management Statement and Order

02/24/2021: Delaration of Gary G. Goldberg re First Amended and Second Amended Case Management Statement and Order

Notice of Ruling

02/03/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

01/14/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

First amended case management statement

01/07/2021: First amended case management statement

Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further supplemental responses to request for production of documents, set one; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg in support thereof on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

12/22/2020: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further supplemental responses to request for production of documents, set one; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg in support thereof on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg in support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further supplemental responses to request for production of documents, set one

12/22/2020: Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg in support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further supplemental responses to request for production of documents, set one

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

12/03/2020: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

Case Management Statement

11/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Electronic Service re: Amendment to Complaint on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

11/20/2020: Proof of Electronic Service re: Amendment to Complaint on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

11/09/2020: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92505.

06/12/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92505.

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: BONNIE B THOMASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingType: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further responses to Request for production of documents, set one; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg in support thereof; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further responses to Request for production of documents, set one; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg in support thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg re: Moving Up Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Declaration of Gary G. Goldberg re: Moving Up Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Gary G. Goldberg re: Moving Up Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Order (Denied); Filed By: BONNIE B THOMASON

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON; Filed By: BONNIE B THOMASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/01/2020; Fine Description: Check #140904 Receipt No.: CV200901-0052-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of THOMASON by KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS represented by ELIZABETH A. FLATLEY filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for all Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3362 Receipt No.: CV200617-0252-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92505.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of THOMASON and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of BONNIE B THOMASON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDBERG, GARY G.