This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 15:14:30 (UTC).

THE STATE BAR VS BAKAL

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 THE STATE BAR filed an Other lawsuit against BAKAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James Latting. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0924

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

James Latting

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

Claimant

PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

RONALD GREGORY BAKAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA

845 South Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2515

Claimant Attorney

KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

Attorney at KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

 

Court Documents

Petition Filed. (Palm Springs)

02/04/2019: Petition Filed. (Palm Springs)

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92260.

02/04/2019: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92260.

Declaration of COLLIN L.GRANT RE:EX PARTE NOTICE filed

02/04/2019: Declaration of COLLIN L.GRANT RE:EX PARTE NOTICE filed

Ex Parte Application to/for INTERIM ORDERS ASSUMING JURISDICTION/LAW PRATICE by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed

02/04/2019: Ex Parte Application to/for INTERIM ORDERS ASSUMING JURISDICTION/LAW PRATICE by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed

Proof of service by Mail of VERIFIED APPL/EX PARTE/DECL/PROPOSED ORDER on MARY MAKAL with a mailing date of 02/05/19 filed. (non-complaint)

02/05/2019: Proof of service by Mail of VERIFIED APPL/EX PARTE/DECL/PROPOSED ORDER on MARY MAKAL with a mailing date of 02/05/19 filed. (non-complaint)

Order to Show Cause Interim Orders Assuming Jurisdiction over Law Practice; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

02/07/2019: Order to Show Cause Interim Orders Assuming Jurisdiction over Law Practice; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

Proof of service by Mail of Verified App/Exp/Decl/OSC/POI on Mary Bakal with a mailing date of 02/08/19 filed. (non-complaint)

02/08/2019: Proof of service by Mail of Verified App/Exp/Decl/OSC/POI on Mary Bakal with a mailing date of 02/08/19 filed. (non-complaint)

Notice OF ERRATA REGARDING [PROPOSED]PERMANENT ORDER ASSUMING JURISDICTION OVER THE LAW PRACTICE by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed.

03/19/2019: Notice OF ERRATA REGARDING [PROPOSED]PERMANENT ORDER ASSUMING JURISDICTION OVER THE LAW PRACTICE by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed.

Proof of service by Mail of NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING[PROPOSED] on MARY BAKAL with a mailing date of 03/19/19 filed. (non-complaint)

03/19/2019: Proof of service by Mail of NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING[PROPOSED] on MARY BAKAL with a mailing date of 03/19/19 filed. (non-complaint)

Order re Permanent Order Assuming Jurisdiction over the Law Practice of Ronald Gregory Bakal; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

03/21/2019: Order re Permanent Order Assuming Jurisdiction over the Law Practice of Ronald Gregory Bakal; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

Proof of service by Mail of ORDER ASSUMING JURISDICTION OVER LAW PRACTICE on MARY BAKAL & ANGELA JOHNSTONE with a mailing date of 03/26/19 filed. (non-complaint)

03/26/2019: Proof of service by Mail of ORDER ASSUMING JURISDICTION OVER LAW PRACTICE on MARY BAKAL & ANGELA JOHNSTONE with a mailing date of 03/26/19 filed. (non-complaint)

Notice ADVERSE INTEREST IN ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT AND OVER ANY ASSETS OF RONALD BAKAL by PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC filed.

10/31/2019: Notice ADVERSE INTEREST IN ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT AND OVER ANY ASSETS OF RONALD BAKAL by PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC filed.

Proof of service by Mail of MOTION FOR ORDERS/PROPOSED ORDER on INTERESTED PARTIES with a mailing date of 08/14/20 filed. (non-complaint)

08/14/2020: Proof of service by Mail of MOTION FOR ORDERS/PROPOSED ORDER on INTERESTED PARTIES with a mailing date of 08/14/20 filed. (non-complaint)

Motion to/for ORDERS F/DISPOSITION OF UNDISTRIBUTED CLIENT FILES & OTHER PROPERTY by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed

08/14/2020: Motion to/for ORDERS F/DISPOSITION OF UNDISTRIBUTED CLIENT FILES & OTHER PROPERTY by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Motion for Orders re Disposition on 09/22/20 at 8:30 in Department PS2.

09/09/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Motion for Orders re Disposition on 09/22/20 at 8:30 in Department PS2.

Opposition to MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF UNDISBURSED FUNDS by PROSPOCT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC filed

09/10/2020: Opposition to MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF UNDISBURSED FUNDS by PROSPOCT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC filed

Request for Judicial Notice filed by PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC.

09/10/2020: Request for Judicial Notice filed by PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC.

Declaration of BRYCE CULLINANE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION filed

09/10/2020: Declaration of BRYCE CULLINANE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION filed

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR ORDER TO TERMINATE JURISDICTION OVER LAW PRACTICE OF RONALD GREGORY BAKAL on Petition of THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Filed By: THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion Motion for Termination of Assumption and Proposed Order; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion Motion for Termination of Assumption and Proposed Order by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion Motion for Termination of Assumption and Proposed Order by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Terminating Jurisdiction over the Law Practice of Ronald Gregory Bakal; Honorable Lawrence W Fry; Filed By: THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition of THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/12/2021; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20210712-00459.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order (hearing) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO TERMINATE JURISDICTION OVER LAW PRACTICE OF RONALD GREGORY BAKAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF COLLIN L. GRANT on Petition of THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) for hearing on 08/23/2021; Filed By: THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO TERMINATE JURISDICTION OVER LAW PRACTICE OF RONALD GREGORY BAKAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF COLLIN L. GRANT on Petition of THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Filed By: THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to/for ORDERS F/DISPOSITION OF UNDISTRIBUTED CLIENT FILES & OTHER PROPERTY by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • HearingType: Ex Parte Hearing re INTERIM ORDERS ASSUMING JURISDICTION/LAW PRATICE.; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order to Show Cause Interim Orders Assuming Jurisdiction over Law Practice; Honorable Pro Tem David M. Chapman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re INTERIM ORDERS ASSUMING JURISDICTION/LAW PRATICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of service by Mail of VERIFIED APPL/EX PARTE/DECL/PROPOSED ORDER on MARY MAKAL with a mailing date of 02/05/19 filed. (non-complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: ASSUMING JURISDICTION OVER THE LAW PRATICE for hearing on 02/07/19 submitted by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR).; Filed By: THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application to/for INTERIM ORDERS ASSUMING JURISDICTION/LAW PRATICE by THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR) filed; Filed By: THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of COLLIN L.GRANT RE:EX PARTE NOTICE filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92260.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition Filed. (Palm Springs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketFilings: Petition of THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA (STATE BAR); Disposition: Court Finding 08/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less