This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 00:55:12 (UTC).

THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO VS 91 ENTERPRISE

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against 91 ENTERPRISE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1178

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC

Defendants

91 ENTERPRISE LLC

MICA BEAUTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE & MALLORY ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE & MALLORY ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS

ALLEN MATKINS LECKGAMBLE & MALLORY

1901 Avenue Of The Stars #1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6019

ALLEN MATKINS LECKGAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS

Three Embarcadero Center 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4074

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC filed WITHOUT prejudice

03/26/2019: Request for Dismissal of Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC filed WITHOUT prejudice

System Generated Notice re: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

03/11/2019: System Generated Notice re: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCON) Form CM-200.

03/11/2019: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCON) Form CM-200.

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC as to 91 ENTERPRISE LLC; mailing date of 02/21/19 filed.

02/27/2019: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC as to 91 ENTERPRISE LLC; mailing date of 02/21/19 filed.

Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC and filed.

02/15/2019: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

02/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

02/15/2019: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Over $25,000 (Palm Springs)

02/15/2019: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Over $25,000 (Palm Springs)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c).; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC filed WITHOUT prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCON) Form CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC as to 91 ENTERPRISE LLC; mailing date of 02/21/19 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/15/2019; Fine Description: Check #138570 Receipt No.: CV190215-0059-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Over $25,000 (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketFilings: Unlawful Detainer Complaint of THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GARDENS ON EL PASEO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 91 ENTERPRISE LLC. DBA BRILLIANCE NEW YORK is a litigant