This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 23:51:00 (UTC).

THE ARBORS VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 05/22/2014 THE ARBORS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1128

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS

Defendant

DUSTIN SMITH

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHONFELD, DAVID S

801 E Chapman Ave Suite 214

Fullerton, CA 92831

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2014 OF THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DUSTIN SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/22/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2014 OF THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/22/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2014 OF THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS AS TO DUSTIN SMITH, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/09/14

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS.

DECLARATION OF RE: PROOF OF SE

DECLARATION OF RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO TENANT FILED

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO TENANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/09/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2014 OF THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS AS TO DUSTIN SMITH, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2014 OF THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/22/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2014 OF THE ARBORS AT CALIFORNIA OAKS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DUSTIN SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/22/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 7/25/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less