This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:02:08 (UTC).

TERRA TECH CORP VS WESTLAND HEATING & AIR

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 TERRA TECH CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTLAND HEATING AIR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3636

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMENT CAPITAL INVESTMENTS INC

TERRA TECH CORP

Defendants

WESTLAND HEATING &AIR CONDITIONING INC

KIM HELTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHALTER

18400 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 20512

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2019 OF TERRA TECH CORP AS TO WESTLAND HEATING &AIR CONDITIONING INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/18/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2019 OF TERRA TECH CORP AS TO KIM HELTON; MAILING DATE OF 07/23/19 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2019 OF TERRA TECH CORP AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2019 OF TERRA TECH CORP AS TO WESTLAND HEATING &AIR CONDITIONING INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/18/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2019 OF TERRA TECH CORP AS TO KIM HELTON; MAILING DATE OF 07/23/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2019 OF TERRA TECH CORP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/30/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERRA TECH CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAND HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant