Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 14:48:25 (UTC).

TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC VS OPELT

Case Summary

On 07/30/2014 TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OPELT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0776

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

SHANNON OPELT

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINDHAM, WILLIAM E

1051 E 1St Street

Beaumont, CA 92223

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC SERVED ON SHANNON OPELT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/30/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO SHANNON OPELT FILED.

170.6 FILED BY TEEL INVESTMENT

170.6 FILED BY TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 07/30/14.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/12/14

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/12/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 07/30/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO SHANNON OPELT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/30/2014 OF TEEL INVESTMENTS LLC SERVED ON SHANNON OPELT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/30/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/29/14 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDHAM, WILLIAM E