This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:04:13 (UTC).

TATE VS RIVERSIDE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 TATE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COUNTY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9156

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. JANE TATE

Defendants

JUAN PEREZ

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

HECTOR VIRAY

MICHAEL SIMPSON

TRACY TOWNER

MANNY ACUETO

MARY ORTIZ

JAY ORR

GREG FLANNERY

BRIAN BLACK

GLENN BAUDE

RIVERSIDE COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARES LAW GROUP LLP

23 Corporate Plaza Suite 150

Newport Beach, CA 92660

EQUITY LAW GROUP PC

201 S Lake Ave Suite 506

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP

4204 Riverwalk Parkway Suite 250

Riverside, CA 92505

THE SMITH LAW OFFICES

4204 Riverwalk Parkway Ste 250

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

NON-PARTY KATHY WHOLFE LMFTS O

NON-PARTY KATHY WHOLFE LMFTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SHOR

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SHORTEN THE NOTICE PERIOD ON DEFTS MSJ IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL COMPLIANC

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA WITH REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPO SUBPOENA FILED

DECLARATION OF LINDSAY N FRAZI

DECLARATION OF LINDSAY N FRAZIER-KRANE FILED

REQUEST TO SEAL EXHIBIT E IN S

REQUEST TO SEAL EXHIBIT E IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND ORDER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/11/2017 OF R. JANE TATE REMOVE ATTORNEY ARES LAW GROUP LLP FOR PARTY(S) R. JANE TATE AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY EQUITY LAW GROUP PC

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION BY R. JANE TATE FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR CO

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES BY R. JANE TATE FILED

DECLARATION OF KEVIN W CHIANG

DECLARATION OF KEVIN W CHIANG IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE & RELATED DEADLINES FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL R. JANE T

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL R. JANE TATES INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

DECLARATION OF LINDSAY N FRAZI

DECLARATION OF LINDSAY N FRAZIER-KRANE FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR SH

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION TO COMPEL BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

ORDER RE EX PARTE APPL TO SHOR

ORDER RE EX PARTE APPL TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR DEFT COUNTY OF RIVERSIDES MOTION TO COMPEL; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JUAN PEREZ, MICHAEL SIMPSON, JAY ORR, GREG FLANNERY, GLENN BAUDE, MARY ORTIZ, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/11/2017 OF R. JANE TATE BY JUAN PEREZ, MICHAEL SIMPSON, JAY ORR, GREG FLANNERY, GLENN BAUDE, MARY ORTIZ, HECTOR VIRAY, TRACY TOWNER, BRIAN BLACK, MANNY ACUETO REPRESENTED BY SMITH LAW OFFICES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION FOR MEDICAL/MENTAL EXAM - RES92615; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL R. JANE TATES INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL R. JANE TATES INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAM BY R. JANE TATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPL TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE EX PARTE APPL TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR DEFT COUNTY OF RIVERSIDES MOTION TO COMPEL; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION TO COMPEL.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION TO COMPEL BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • FILING FEE OF $450.00 FOR COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE IS WAIVED-EXEMPT PER GOVT CODE 6103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/11/2017 OF R. JANE TATE BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY THE SMITH LAW OFFICES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/11/2017 OF R. JANE TATE AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; MAILING DATE OF 10/25/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/12/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/11/2017 OF R. JANE TATE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less