This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 14:46:36 (UTC).

TAT INVESTMENT VS ALL PERSONS

Case Summary

On 06/02/2016 TAT INVESTMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALL PERSONS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0944

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAT INVESTMENT, LLC

Defendant

ALL PERSONS AND ENTITIES IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSO & DUCKWORTH,LLP

9090 Irvine Center Drive 2Nd Floor

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TAT INVESTMENT, LLC.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/19/16

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC AS TO ALL PERSONS AND ENTITIES IN POSSESSION

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC AS TO ALL PERSONS AND ENTITIES IN POSSESSION; MAILING DATE OF 06/08/16 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (SOUTHWEST)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TAT INVESTMENT, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/19/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC AS TO ALL PERSONS AND ENTITIES IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY TAT INVESTMENT, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT CLERKS JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY TAT INVESTMENT, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC AS TO ALL PERSONS AND ENTITIES IN POSSESSION; MAILING DATE OF 06/08/16 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/01/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2016 OF TAT INVESTMENT, LLC AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less