This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 19:11:39 (UTC).

TAN VS SHEPHERD

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 TAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHEPHERD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1278

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIHUI TAN

Defendant

RENEE SHEPHERD

Winchester, CA 92596

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2017 OF DAIHUI TAN AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92596.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2017 OF DAIHUI TAN BY RENEE SHEPHERD REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON WILLIAM E.WINDHAM WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/01/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY RENEE SHEPHERD IS GRA; CLERK P.THIPHAVONG (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2017 OF DAIHUI TAN AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RENEE SHEPHERD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/28/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY DAIHUI TAN - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/25/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGM

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 09/08/17; SIGNED BY HONORABLE PRO TEM ROBERT ENGLISH.

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELI

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/08/17 S205 PRO TEM ROBERT ENGLISH)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DAIHUI TAN.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DAIHUI TAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/08/17 S205 PRO TEM ROBERT ENGLISH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 09/08/17; SIGNED BY HONORABLE PRO TEM ROBERT ENGLISH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • HEARING RE: BANKRUPTCY STATUS; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/25/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON WILLIAM E.WINDHAM WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/01/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2017 OF DAIHUI TAN BY RENEE SHEPHERD REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92596.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/25/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2017 OF DAIHUI TAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less