This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2020 at 06:20:47 (UTC).

TAHBAZ VS LEGACY VILLAS

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 TAHBAZ filed an Other lawsuit against LEGACY VILLAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7468

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEHROUZ TAHBAZ

BEHZAD TAHBAZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LEGACY WILLAS AT LA QUINTA HOMEOWNERS

LEGACY VILLAS AT LA QUINTA HOMEOWNERS

JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC

PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP

STEPHEN M. KIRKLAND

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC

PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP

STEPHEN M. KIRKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPIRA, SAMUEL R

16215 Moorpark St

Encino, CA 91436-1327

BISNO, ROBERT H

9255 Sunset Blvd Ste 920

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DELPHI LAW GROUP LLP

1901 Camino Vida Roble #100

Carlsbad, CA 92008

ANDERHOLT WHITTAKER LLP

73525 El Paseo Suite E-2516

Palm Desert, CA 92260

COCHRAN, DAVIS & ASSOCIATES

36 Malaga Cove Plaza Suite 206

Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274

LAW OFFICE OF JEFFM YOSS

2825 East Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite B109

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

COCHRAN, DAVIS & ASSOCIATES

36 Malaga Cove Plaza Suite 206

Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274

LAW OFFICE OF JEFFM YOSS

2825 East Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite B109

Palm Springs, CA 92262

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/09/2020 OF JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC BY PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP, STEPHEN M. KIRKLAND REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF JEFFM YOSS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LEGACY VILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR CO

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY LEGACY VILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS FILED

NOTICE OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES BY PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY LEGA

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY LEGACY VILLAS FILED

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 03/12/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PETERS & FR

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP, STEPHEN M. KIRKLAND REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF JEFFM YOSS FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BEHROUZ TAHBAZ, BEHZAD TAHBAZ

DECLARATION OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ

DECLARATION OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2019 OF LEGACY VILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS SERVED ON PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/30/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2019 OF LEGACY WILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS AND FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2018 OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ BY LEGACY WILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS REPRESENTED BY DELPHI LAW GROUP LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BEHROUZ TAHBAZ, BEHZAD TAHBAZ

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LEGACY WILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2018 OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ AND FILED.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 06/01/20 SUBMITTED BY JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE:ATTORNEYS FEES RECEIVED ON 05/04/20 SUBMITTED BY JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2018 OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ AS TO PLAINTIFF BEHZAD TAHBAZ FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/09/2020 OF JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC BY PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP, STEPHEN M. KIRKLAND REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF JEFFM YOSS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO (PLAINTIFF) DEFENDANT LEGACY VILLAS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY BEHROUZ TAHBAZ, BEHZAD TAHBAZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket--ALSO SERVED 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF PETERS & FREEDMAN LLP ON JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICES INC WITH DATE OF MAILING 03/31/20--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LEGACY VILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2018 OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ SERVED ON LEGACY VILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/20/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketFAX FILING BY BEHROUZ TAHBAZ ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2018 OF BEHROUZ TAHBAZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketUPDATE PARTY LEGACY VILLAS AT LAQUINTA HOMEOWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less