This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 22:15:59 (UTC).

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC vs BRADCM INC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRADCM INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kira L. Klatchko and Kira L Klatchko. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2318

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kira L. Klatchko

Kira L Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

UNITED PAVING CO.

Defendants

BRADCM INC

DHS VERDE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAILY ALJIAN

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREA PARIS LAW PC

Attorney at ANDREA PARIS LAW PC

Lisamarie McDermott

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

03/12/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

Request for Dismissal

03/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

03/11/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

12/14/2020: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

12/04/2020: Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Case Management Statement on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

11/30/2020: Case Management Statement on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

11/30/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Answer to Complaint on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

11/25/2020: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Case Management Statement on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

11/25/2020: Case Management Statement on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Order Granting Plaintiffs Application to Serve Defendant DHS Verde LLC through the California Secretary of State

11/16/2020: Order Granting Plaintiffs Application to Serve Defendant DHS Verde LLC through the California Secretary of State

Proof of Service on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

11/12/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Declaration of Reed Aljian in support of Application for Order

11/12/2020: Declaration of Reed Aljian in support of Application for Order

Application to/for Order to Serve Defendant DHS Verde through the California Secretary of State on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

11/12/2020: Application to/for Order to Serve Defendant DHS Verde through the California Secretary of State on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Order for Publication is Denied and filed; Honorable Judge Kira L Klatchko.

10/02/2020: Order for Publication is Denied and filed; Honorable Judge Kira L Klatchko.

Answer to Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC by BRADCM INC represented by ANDREA PARIS LAW PC filed. (Over $25,000.00)

08/31/2020: Answer to Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC by BRADCM INC represented by ANDREA PARIS LAW PC filed. (Over $25,000.00)

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC as to BRADCM INC; mailing date of 07/20/20 filed.

08/28/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC as to BRADCM INC; mailing date of 07/20/20 filed.

Notice OF RECORDATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) by SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC filed.

08/17/2020: Notice OF RECORDATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) by SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC and filed.

06/15/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC and filed.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC; Filed By: DHS VERDE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/03/2020; Fine Description: Check #D3797386 Receipt No.: 20201203-00561.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/01/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *4312 Receipt No.: 20201201-00369.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC by BRADCM INC represented by ANDREA PARIS LAW PC filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: BRADCM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC as to BRADCM INC; mailing date of 07/20/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF RECORDATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) by SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC filed.; Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/15/2020; Fine Description: Check #D3735994 Receipt No.: CV200615-0047-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS1. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC; Disposition: Dismissal After Settlement Conference 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DHS VERDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisamarie McDermott