This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 08:35:28 (UTC).

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC vs ASARO BUILDERS INC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASARO BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and David M Chapman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4141

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

David M Chapman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

UNITED PAVING COMPANY

Defendants

ASARO BUILDERS INC

HORIZON GARDENS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAILY ALJIAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action

06/03/2021: Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action

Request for Dismissal

05/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

04/26/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

03/10/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

03/10/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Notice of Recordation of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

03/09/2021: Notice of Recordation of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

03/01/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

02/24/2021: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Case Management Statement on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

02/23/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

02/23/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Proof of Service on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

02/22/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to Serve Defendant Horizon Gardens LLC through the California Secretary of State; Honorable Judge David M Chapman

02/04/2021: Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to Serve Defendant Horizon Gardens LLC through the California Secretary of State; Honorable Judge David M Chapman

Proof of Service

02/03/2021: Proof of Service

Declaration of Reed Aljian

02/03/2021: Declaration of Reed Aljian

Notice of Application and Application for Order to Serve Def through The California Secretary of State

02/03/2021: Notice of Application and Application for Order to Serve Def through The California Secretary of State

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC as to ASARO BUILDERS INC; mailing date of 10/15/20 filed.

10/27/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC as to ASARO BUILDERS INC; mailing date of 10/15/20 filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC and filed.

09/14/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92234.

09/11/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92234.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action; Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: David M. Chapman; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Recordation of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens); Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC; Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/26/2021; Fine Description: Check #3812387 Receipt No.: 20210226-00543.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Application and Application for Order to Serve Def through The California Secretary of State; Filed By: SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: --Also Served Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC on HORIZON GARDENS LLC with date of mailing 10/26/20-- on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC as to ASARO BUILDERS INC; mailing date of 10/15/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV200914-0040-V.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92234.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC; Disposition: Dismissal After Other ADR 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASARO BUILDERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant