Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 23:01:24 (UTC).

SUN WORLD VS BOZICK;ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2004 SUN WORLD filed an Other lawsuit against BOZICK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7718

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MARION PETER TUDOR

MICHAEL BOZICK

RICHARD BAGDASARIAN INC A CALIFORNIA

TUDOR RANCH INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NORTH SHORE RANCH A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

MECCA ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

NICK BOZICK AND CYNTHIA B BETETA

MALI BASTA RANCHESA BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

MECCA STAR RANCHESA BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

SULTON RANCH A CALIFORNIA SOLE

MICHAEL BOZICK ANDBOBBIE BOZICK

MALI BASTA RANCHESA CALIFORNIA SOLE

RISING STAR RANCHES A BUSINESSENTITY

SALTON RANCHES A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ROEMER HARNIK & NETHERY LLP

45025 Manitou Dr

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SWAJIAN & SWAJIAN

74-090 El Paseo Suite 101

Palm Desert, CA 92260

JOSEPH A GIBBS & ASSOCIATES

74900 Highway 111 #222

Indian Wells, CA 92210

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

DECLARATION OF DAVID O MARGULE

DECLARATION OF DAVID O MARGULEAS IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLGE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON MICHAEL BOZICK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON RICHARD BAGDASARIANINC A CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON MECCA ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON TUDOR RANCH INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE BY MARION PETER TUDOR, TUDOR RANCH INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY SWAJIAN & SWAJIAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON MICHAEL BOZICK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MECCA ENTER

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MECCA ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED REPRESENTED BY JOSEPH A GIBBS & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2005 OF MECCA ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED BY SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE REPRESENTED BY ROEMER HARNIK & NETHERY LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DEFENSE COUNSEL BY RICHARD BAGDASARIANINC A CALIFORNIA, MECCA ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED, MICHAEL BOZICK, MALI BASTA RANCHESA CALIFORNIASOLE, MICHAEL BOZICK ANDBOBBIE BOZICK, MICHAEL BOZICK ANDBOBBIE BOZICK, SULTON RANCH A CALIFORNIA SOLE, NICK BOZICK AND CYNTHIA B BETETA FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARION PETER TUDOR, TUDOR RANCH INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL BOZICK

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL BOZICK

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MARION PETER TUDOR, TUDOR RANCH INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2007
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2006
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMSISAL SUBMITTED BY SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2005
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING AND MANDATORY SETTELMENT CONFERENCE BY SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MARION PETER TUDOR, TUDOR RANCH INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL BOZICK

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2005
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON MARION PETER TUDOR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON MECCA ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON RICHARD BAGDASARIANINC A CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: PROOFS OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2004 OF SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL INC A DELAWARE SERVED ON MICHAEL BOZICK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/04 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID O MARGULEAS IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant