This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 09:02:34 (UTC).

SULLIVAN vs ANZEL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 SULLIVAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANZEL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0325

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STACEY A SULLIVAN

DENNIS M SULLIVAN

STEPHEN D WILHEM

ANN L. SULLIVAN

Defendants

LINDA ANZEL

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF THE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFFS' TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE TO THE PROPERTY

MEREY ANZEL

JONATHAN ANZEL

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF MEREY ANZEL, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Morris Marcus

Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz

Attorney at Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

09/03/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN

09/03/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of The Testate and Intestate Successors of the Deceased on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

08/24/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of The Testate and Intestate Successors of the Deceased on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

08/20/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

Order on Motion of Plaintiffs for Order Authorizing Plaintiffs and their Attorneys to receive from Maricopa County Arizona a certified copy of the death certificate of Defendant Merey Anzel, Decedent; Honorable David M Chapman

07/07/2021: Order on Motion of Plaintiffs for Order Authorizing Plaintiffs and their Attorneys to receive from Maricopa County Arizona a certified copy of the death certificate of Defendant Merey Anzel, Decedent; Honorable David M Chapman

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

06/14/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN

06/14/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/09/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

06/03/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/24/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

04/28/2021: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

03/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

12/14/2020: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

12/14/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

11/13/2020: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

11/13/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued - Pre-disposition OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued - Pre-disposition OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Marcus Watanabe & Enowitz, DENNIS M SULLIVAN, ANN L. SULLIVAN, STEPHEN D WILHEM, STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Summons; Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of The Testate and Intestate Successors of the Deceased on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN; Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Amendment to Complaint; Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN; Filed By: STEPHEN D WILHEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN; Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/14/2020; Fine Description: Check #278597 Receipt No.: 20201214-00385.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: DENNIS M SULLIVAN; ANN L. SULLIVAN; STEPHEN D WILHEM; STACEY A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DENNIS M SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS DAVID M.