This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 16:41:25 (UTC).

ST.PAUL MERCURY VS. ACCENT TILE

Case Summary

On 10/21/2014 ST PAUL MERCURY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ACCENT TILE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9946

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

ACCENT TILE INC

ALLIANCE MECHANICAL HEATING AND AIR CONDITI

HY-TECH TILE DESIGNS INC

PRO-LINE PLASTERING INC

ALUMINUM TECHNOLOGY

PREMIER PLUMBING COMPANY LBR ENTERPRISES

SENTRY FENCE COMPANY

SPECIALTY ROOFING INC

RII PLASTERING INC

JENSTAR

HANLEY'S WELDING

B&B FRAMING INC

PETERSON BROTERS CONSTRUCTION

PACIFIC SHORES MASONRY INC

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ACCENT TILE INC

ALLIANCE MECHANICAL HEATING AND AIR CONDITI

AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY

CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA

HY-TECH TILE DESIGNS INC

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC

PRO-LINE PLASTERING INC

ALUMINUM TECHNOLOGY

PREMIER PLUMBING COMPANY LBR ENTERPRISES

SENTRY FENCE COMPANY

SPECIALTY ROOFING INC

RII PLASTERING INC

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES

HANLEY'S WELDING

B&B FRAMING INC

PETERSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

PACIFIC SHORES MASONRY INC

105 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP APLC

650 Town Center Dr, Ste 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

27710 Jefferson Ave #102

Temecula, CA 92590

Defendant Attorneys

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN OMEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

21700 Copley Dr, Ste 310

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Ste 105

Torrance, CA 90505

HAMMONS & BALDINO

2601 Airport Dr #105

Torrance, CA 90505

ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

27710 Jefferson Ave #102

Temecula, CA 92590

Other Attorneys

MCCLUSKEY & MONTGOMERY LLP

6242 Westchester Pkwy Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

MORISON & PROUGH LLP

2540 Camino Diablo #100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

LETOFSKY * MCLAIN

3655 Nobel Dr Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

HINES HAMPTON LLP

34 Executive Park #260

Irvine, CA 92614

YARON & ASSOCIATES

1300 Clay Street Ste 800

Oakland, CA 94612

HEROLD & SAGER ATTORNEY AT LAW

550 Second Street Suite 200

Encinitas, CA 92024

LAW OFFICES OF SEMHA ALWAYA

2200 Powell Street Suite 110

Emeryville, CA 94608

BLAU & ASSOCIATES PC

128 Center Street

El Segundo, CA 90245

MILLER, TIM

5225 Canyon Crest Driive #71-143

Riverside, CA 92507

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M BUREK

550 North Parkcenter Drive Suite 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

2050 Main St, Ste 600

Irvine, CA 92614

CRESSWELL ECHEGUREN RODGERS & HARVEY

180 Grand Ave, Ste 440

Oakland, CA 94612

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ELSINORE CONSTRUCTION FILED.

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY BY TIG INSURANCE COMPANY REPRESENTED BY BOORNAZIAN JENSEN &GARTHE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENC

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET ON 02/27/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 02 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 02/27/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 12

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO PREMIER PLUMBING COMPANY LBR ENTERPRISES FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO CONTINUE MTN RELATED FILING DATES IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ST

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIP & ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION ON ALL PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/22/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE OF

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE OF SECOND AMENDED CMPLT ON AXIS BY ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO J. TALLEY CORPORATION FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO SPECIALTY ROOFING INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO HY-TECH TILE, INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO NORTH ORANGE COASTPAINTING INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO SENTRY FENCE COMPANY FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO ALUMINUM TECHNOLOGY, PBC COASTAL CONCEPTS INC, COASTAL CONCEPTS INC, SOUTH COAST EQUIPMENT INC, ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO BOURNE DEVELOPMENT FILED.

434 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • HODACS HEARING SET FOR 06/23/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR HEARING MINUTE ORDER RE COURT CONTINUES OSC AS TO LAW OFFICES OF SEMHA ALWAYA; REASON RETURNED: NOT DELIVERABLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO NATIONAL UNION FIREINSURANCE COMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO LEXINGTON INSURANCECOMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONTINUES HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
639 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2014
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 02/03/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 03 - RES40150.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR DEMURRER ON 02/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • RE-ASSIGN DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO 03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HY-TECH TILE DESIGNS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where HANLEY'S WELDING is a litigant