This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:41:55 (UTC).

STOKES VS MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 STOKES filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG G. RIEMER and SUNSHINE S SYKES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5921

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

CRAIG G. RIEMER

SUNSHINE S SYKES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRYANT STOKES

NOEL BULANDOS

ELLEN PACSON

KELLY PRIMERANO

MARIN DELGADO

PAUL PRIMERANO

HEMALI LUCAS

BRIAN HARRIS

DAVID MCKEE

ELLSWORTH LUCAS

JOE MONACO

FAYE DENISE PITTENGER

ERIKA HARRIS

ADRIANA ORTIZ

MARGARET MCKEE

LORETTA HOWERTON

JOEL ORTIZ

CYNTHIA DELGADO

STACEY MONACO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd 14Th Floor.

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HUGUENIN KAHN LLP

3741 Douglas Blvd Ste 290

Roseville, CA 95661

MORROW & WHITE

1600 Dove Street Suite 315

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Other Attorneys

JEFFERY & GROSFELDLLP ATTORNEY AT LAW

725 Town & Country Rd, Ste 450

Orange, CA 92868

LETOFSKY * MCLAIN

3655 Nobel Dr Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

7964 Arjons Dr., Ste. I

San Diego, CA 92126

RESNICK & LOUIS

9891 Irvine Center Dr., #200

Irvine, CA 92618

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

7700 Irvine Center Drive Suite 275

Irvine, CA 92618

MURCHISON & CUMMING

801 South Grand Ave 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

STRADLING, YOCCA, CARLSON, & RAUTH

660 Newport Center Dr Suite 1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6441

HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

20320 W.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

21700 Copley Dr, Ste 310

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER

One Pointe Drive 6Th Floor

Brea, CA 92821

LAW OFFICE OF PATRICK J CAMPBELL

3880 Atherton Rd

Rocklin, CA 95765

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO FIBER CARE BATHS, INC., DW TRIM, INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2019 OF PACIFIC MASONRY, INC. FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2018 OF BRYANT STOKES FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC BY CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC. REPRESENTED BY ANDREWS & RHODES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF JESSICA L MORAN

DECLARATION OF JESSICA L MORAN IN ADVANCE OF THE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC BY MATRIX SURFACES, INC. REPRESENTED BY BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SET

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST BSA FRAMING INC IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

DECLARATION OF SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION OF SERVICE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS, INC.; MAILING DATE OF 03/29/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO PACIFIC MASONRY, INC.; MAILING DATE OF 04/11/19 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC NAMING ROES/MOES 1 TO BE A & J GRADING CONTRACTORS, INC. FILED

JOINT STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE

JOINT STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING A

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY BY BRYANT STOKES FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2018 OF BRYANT STOKES SERVED ON MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/26/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE

COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • HearingDept: 06; Action text: HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DREW C. WAGNER-WEIR IN ADVANCE OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO CAL-WEST NURSERIES,INC., MATRIX SURFACES, INC., NP MECHANICAL, INC., SCHAMBER ELECTRIC &SONS, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO TOTAL COMFORT, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO VALLEY PACIFIC CONCRETE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
250 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketREMOVE FROM THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2018 OF BRYANT STOKES THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) BRYANT STOKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketREMOVE FROM THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2018 OF BRYANT STOKES THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) NOEL BULANDOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 - COMPLEX CASE (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 10/01/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92883.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2018 OF BRYANT STOKES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/01/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY BRYANT STOKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2018 OF BRYANT STOKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPBELL PATRICK J