This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:48:23 (UTC).

STEGMULLER VS EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 STEGMULLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5157

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Minors and Plaintiffs

CAITLYNN PEDERSEN

SHARON STEGMULLER

Defendants

CARDIOTHORACIC SURGERY ASSOCIATES OF THE DE

JOSEPH WILSON MD

EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER

MATTHEW POWERS MD

EISENHOWER MEDICALASSOCIATES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorney

HODES MILMAN LIEBECK LLP

9210 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

SCHMID & VOILES

333 City Boulevard West Suite 720

Orange, CA 92868-2924

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE

22972 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FO

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER NAMING DOES 1 TO BE EISENHOWER MEDICALASSOCIATES INC FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER BY EISENHOWER MEDICALASSOCIATES INC REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY EISEN

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MATTHEW POWERS MD

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSEPH WILSON MD

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JOSEPH WILSON MD.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SHARON STEGMULLER, CAITLYNN PEDERSEN

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF CAITLYNN PEDERSEN NAMED AS HEIDI KAPPELER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER AS TO CARDIOTHORACIC SURGERY ASSOCIATES OF THE DE; MAILING DATE OF 10/09/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER AS TO MATTHEW POWERS MD; MAILING DATE OF 10/16/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER SERVED ON EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/06/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY SHARON STEGMULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • TSC CALENDARED ON 09/27/18 IN DEPT. PS2. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 09/27/18 IN DEPT. 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SHARON STEGMULLER, CAITLYNN PEDERSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JOSEPH WILSON MD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY JOSEPH WILSON MD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSEPH WILSON MD

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER BY JOSEPH WILSON MD REPRESENTED BY SCHMID & VOILES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER SERVED ON EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/06/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER AS TO MATTHEW POWERS MD; MAILING DATE OF 10/16/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER AS TO CARDIOTHORACIC SURGERY ASSOCIATES OF THE DE; MAILING DATE OF 10/09/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2017 OF SHARON STEGMULLER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF CAITLYNN PEDERSEN NAMED AS HEIDI KAPPELER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/20/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATTHEW POWERS MD is a litigant

Latest cases where EISENHOWER MEDICALASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER is a litigant